Sonder Canada Inc. et al v. Sonder Group LLC

Plaintiff: Sonder Canada Inc. and Sonder USA Inc.
Defendant: Sonder Group LLC
Case Number: 4:2017cv04147
Filed: July 21, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/1/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
October 18, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 24 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 12 Amended Complaint for False Designation of Origin, Trademark Infringement, and Unfair Competition filed by Sonder Canada Inc., Sonder Group LLC, Sonder USA Inc. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2017 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/18/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 4, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis Westmore Granting 20 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonder Canada Inc. et al v. Sonder Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonder Canada Inc.
Represented By: Eric J. Ball
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonder USA Inc.
Represented By: Eric J. Ball
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonder Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?