Sierra Club v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al

Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Case Number: 4:2017cv05273
Filed: September 12, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 28 Stipulation and Order. Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Hearings. filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Sierr a Club. Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/16/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
March 29, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 23 Case Management Conference - Initial, Set Deadlines/Hearings, 24 Order Setting Settlement Conference filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Cu stoms and Border Protection, Sierra Club. Settlement conference is vacated. Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2018 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/29/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
December 5, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 17 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Sierra Club. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/5/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra Club v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Marta R. Darby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?