Sierra Club v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: |
Sierra Club |
Defendant: |
U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs and Border Protection |
Case Number: |
4:2017cv05273 |
Filed: |
September 12, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
Oakland Office |
County: |
Alameda |
Presiding Judge: |
Kandis A. Westmore |
Nature of Suit: |
Freedom of Information Act |
Cause of Action: |
05 U.S.C. § 552 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 14, 2018 |
Filing
36
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 32 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Sierra Club. Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/14/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
|
July 16, 2018 |
Filing
32
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 28 Stipulation and Order. Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Hearings. filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Sierr a Club. Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/16/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
|
March 29, 2018 |
Filing
28
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 23 Case Management Conference - Initial, Set Deadlines/Hearings, 24 Order Setting Settlement Conference filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Cu stoms and Border Protection, Sierra Club. Settlement conference is vacated. Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2018 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/29/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
|
December 5, 2017 |
Filing
18
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 17 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Sierra Club. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/5/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?