Morgan et al v. Apple Inc.

Plaintiff: Deonn Morgan, Lydia Zepeda, Sophia Ivy, Kelly Okorocha and Jennifer Zielinski
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 4:2017cv05277
Filed: September 12, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2018 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Complaint due by 6/5/2018. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
December 29, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 29 Setting Briefing Schedule And Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/29/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
November 20, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 23 Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2018. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 12/14/2017 continued to 3/1/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/20/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deonn Morgan
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Sophia Jaclyn Goren
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Zepeda
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Sophia Jaclyn Goren
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Ivy
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Sophia Jaclyn Goren
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Okorocha
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Sophia Jaclyn Goren
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Zielinski
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Sophia Jaclyn Goren
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?