J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Segura

Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Jesus Segura
Case Number: 4:2017cv05335
Filed: September 14, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2018 40 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in Plaintiff's favor and against Defendant Jesus Segura, individually and dba La Selva Taqueria. The Court VACATES the compliance hearing currently set for June 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/12/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
May 31, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 21 Motion for Default Judgment - by the Court, filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc., 34 Report and Recommendations, and Order SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING.Compliance hearing re filing revised form of judgment is set for Friday, 6/15/18 at 9:01 AM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/31/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
April 19, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS to grant Plaintiff's 21 MOTION for Default Judgment as to JESUS SEGURA filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc., ORDER discharging 26 3/6/18 Order to Show Cause. Objections due by 5/3/2018. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/19/2018. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 9, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking 30 Amended Declaration of Affiant filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. Plaintiff may file a supplemental declaration of John Polete within 7 days that is consistent with this order. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/9/2018. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
March 6, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to Plaintiff. Show Cause Response due by 3/16/2018. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/6/2018. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
February 20, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 21 MOTION for Default Judgment. Plaintiff to submit a proposed order and supplemental briefing by the reply deadline, ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 21 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to JESUS SEGURA : Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/20/2018. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?