Kubin et al v. Abode Services Agency et al

Plaintiff: Alena Gavrilenko and Feliks Kubin
Defendant: Katie Fantin, Abode Services Agency, Glenn Wong, Noelia Vazquez, Sherry Galahan and Rebekah Dennison
Case Number: 4:2018cv00658
Filed: January 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Referring Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2018 Filing 15 Receipt - Acknowledging the Return of Docket Number 5 - Exhibit Re: #1 Complaint by Feliks Kubin. Return of Document per Order filed at Docket Entry #14 . (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #13 Motion for return of original attachments from exhibit on 2/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 13 Request of Return Original Attachments from Exhibit on 2/5/2018 filed by Feliks Kubin. Responses due by 4/13/2018. Replies due by 4/20/2018. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Feliks Kubin. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/2/2018. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kcS, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/2/2018. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kcS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/9/18. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
February 9, 2018 Filing 8 ***PLEASE DISREGARD ORDER******ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/9/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018) Modified on 2/9/2018 (haS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 and #4 Motions for Leave to Proceed IFP and for Reassignment; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint. Objections due by 2/22/2018. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/8/2018. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/9/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2018 Filing 5 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, filed byAlena Gavrilenko, Feliks Kubin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2018: #3 Corrected PDF - All one entry) (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Feliks Kubin. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alena Gavrilenko. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Abode Services Agency, Rebekah Dennison, Katie Fantin, Sherry Galahan, Noelia Vazquez, Glenn Wong. Filed byAlena Gavrilenko, Feliks Kubin. Consent/Declination due by 2/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2018: #2 Proposed Summons) (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kubin et al v. Abode Services Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Fantin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abode Services Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noelia Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Galahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebekah Dennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alena Gavrilenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feliks Kubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?