Weinstein et al v. Kuhl et al
Plaintiff: Marlene G. Weinstein
Defendant: Greg Kuhl, Susan Sparling, Alex Kaplan, Nancy Worrell, Daniel Ward, William Kinnane, Christine Zwerling, Marcia Hodges and Navigators Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv01351
Filed: February 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING DEFENDANTS 7 MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 13 Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date of Motion to Withdraw the Reference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 8 Stipulation to Continue the Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date of Motions to Withdraw the Reference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weinstein et al v. Kuhl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene G. Weinstein
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Fillerup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Kuhl
Represented By: Jason William Mauck
Represented By: Andrew Paul Sclar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Sparling
Represented By: Jason William Mauck
Represented By: Andrew Paul Sclar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Kaplan
Represented By: Jason William Mauck
Represented By: Andrew Paul Sclar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Worrell
Represented By: Jason William Mauck
Represented By: Andrew Paul Sclar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Ward
Represented By: Jason William Mauck
Represented By: Andrew Paul Sclar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Kinnane
Represented By: Jason William Mauck
Represented By: Andrew Paul Sclar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Zwerling
Represented By: Jason William Mauck
Represented By: Andrew Paul Sclar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Hodges
Represented By: Joanne Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael William Melendez
Represented By: Angelo Savino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?