The Estate of Pablo Garcia Toribio et al v. City of Santa Rosa et al

Plaintiff: The Estate of Pablo Garcia Toribio, Margarita Toribio Dominguez and Pablo Garcia Santos
Defendant: City of Santa Rosa, City of Santa Rosa Police Department, Nicholas Vlahandreas, Park Mcallister, Jeffrey Badger, Hank Schreeder and Santa Rosa Police Department
Case Number: 4:2018cv02151
Filed: April 11, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
0 Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
1 Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2018 30 Certification of ADR Session by Evaluator Randolph W. Hall: I hereby certify that the parties in this matter held an ENE session on 8/29/2018. The case did not settle. Further facilitated discussions are not expected. ENE is complete. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 24, 2018 29 Featured Case ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT ENE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/24/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 13, 2018 28 DEFENDANTS ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND byJeffrey Badger, City of Santa Rosa, Park Mcallister, Hank Schreeder, Nicholas Vlahandreas. (Jackson, Robert) (Filed on 8/13/2018) Modified on 8/14/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing ENE Hearing set for 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at The Phillip Burton Federal Building and Courthouse located at 450 Golden Gate Avenue, 16th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94102. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 27 Pre ENE phone conference scheduled on 8/14/2018 at 10:00 AM. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 30, 2018 26 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byPablo Garcia Santos, Margarita Toribio Dominguez, Randolph W. Hall, The Estate of Pablo Garcia Toribio. (Romero, Sandra) (Filed on 7/30/2018) Modified on 7/31/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2018 25 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR CONFIDENTIAL POLICE OFFICER PERSONNEL RECORDS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #23 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 25, 2018 24 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Randolph W. Hall as ENE Evaluator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2018)
July 25, 2018 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order for Confidential Police Officer Pesonnel Records filed by Jeffrey Badger, City of Santa Rosa, Park Mcallister, Santa Rosa Police Department, Hank Schreeder, Nicholas Vlahandreas, The Estate of Pablo Garcia Toribio. (Jackson, Robert) (Filed on 7/25/2018) Modified on 7/26/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2018 22 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #12 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend. Plaintiffs to file Second Amended Complaint no later than 7/30/2018. Defendants shall file their response no later than 8/13/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
July 17, 2018 21 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/17/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
July 16, 2018 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/16/2018. Motion Hearing held and submitted on 7/16/2018 re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Santa Rosa, Santa Rosa Police Department, Hank Schreeder. Case referred to ADR for early neutral evaluation TO BE COMPLETED BY 8/31/18. Second Amended Complaint filed by 7/30/2018. Response filed 8/13/18. Close of Expert Discovery due by 2/8/2019. Close of Fact Discovery due by 12/31/2018. Case Management Statement due by 11/26/2018. Daubert/Dispositive Motions filed by 2/12/2019. Opening Reports due by 1/15/2019. Rebuttal Reports due by 1/29/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. Jury Selection set for 6/17/2019 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Jury Trial set for 6/17/2019 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Daubert/Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint Pretrial Statement filed by 5/17/2019. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 5/31/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance hearing set for Friday, 5/10/2019 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Total Time in Court: 50 minutes. Court Reporter: Kathy Wyatt. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/16/2018)
July 6, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for MONDAY, 7/16/2018 02:01 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The Tuesday 7/17/18 at 2:00pm time is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 19 CLERK'S NOTICE MOVING HEARING ON MOTION TO EARLIER DATE OF MONDAY, JULY 16. 2018 AT 2:01 PM. The Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. no. 12] previously set for Tuesday 7/17/2018 will be held ONE DAY EARLIER, on Monday, 7/16/2018 at 2:01pm, following the Case Management Conference set the same date at 2:00 PM. The 7/17/18 hearing time is VACATED. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2016 02:01 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 2, 2018 18 JOINT RULE 26 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jeffrey Badger, City of Santa Rosa, Park Mcallister, Santa Rosa Police Department, Hank Schreeder, Nicholas Vlahandreas., The Estate of Pablo Garcia Toribio, et al (Jackson, Robert) (Filed on 7/2/2018) Modified on 7/3/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2018 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Romero, Sandra) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 25, 2018 16 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jackson, Robert) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 21, 2018 15 REPLY (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byCity of Santa Rosa, Santa Rosa Police Department, Hank Schreeder. (Jackson, Robert) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
June 19, 2018 14 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss ) For Failure to State a Claim filed byMargarita Toribio Dominguez, The Estate of Pablo Garcia Toribio, Pablo Garcia Santos. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Romero, Sandra) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
June 5, 2018 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byJeffrey Badger, Park Mcallister, Nicholas Vlahandreas. (Jackson, Robert) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
June 5, 2018 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Santa Rosa, Santa Rosa Police Department, Hank Schreeder. Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 6/19/2018. Replies due by 6/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Robert) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
May 7, 2018 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 7/16/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
April 27, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/27/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
April 26, 2018 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 26, 2018 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Margarita Toribio Dominguez, The Estate of Pablo Garcia Toribio, Pablo Garcia Santos.. (Romero, Sandra) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 23, 2018 7 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Badger, City of Santa Rosa, Park Mcallister, Santa Rosa Police Department, Hank Schreeder, Nicholas Vlahandreas. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 20, 2018 6 Proposed Summons. (Romero, Sandra) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
April 12, 2018 Electronic filing error Re: #3 Amended Document filed by The Estate of Pablo Garcia Toribio, Margarita Toribio Dominguez, Pablo Garcia Santos. Incorrect event used. [err101] Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 12, 2018 Electronic filing error Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by The Estate of Pablo Garcia Toribio, Margarita Toribio Dominguez, Pablo Garcia Santos. Summons cannot be issued in blank. Please re-file completed form in its entirety. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 12, 2018 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 11, 2018 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/25/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 3 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Badger, City of Santa Rosa, Park Mcallister, Santa Rosa Police Department, Hank Schreeder, Nicholas Vlahandreas. Filed by Pablo Garcia Santos, Margarita Toribio Dominguez, The Estate of Pablo Garcia Toribio. (Romero, Sandra) (Filed on 4/11/2018) Modified on 4/12/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2018 2 Proposed Summons. (Romero, Sandra) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Jeffrey Badger, City of Santa Rosa, Park Mcallister, Santa Rosa Police Department, Hank Schreeder, Nicholas Vlahandreas (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12263651.). Filed by Margarita Toribio Dominguez, The Estate of Pablo Garcia Toribio, Pablo Garcia Santos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration)(Romero, Sandra) (Filed on 4/11/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Pablo Garcia Toribio et al v. City of Santa Rosa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Pablo Garcia Toribio
Represented By: Sandra Ruvalcaba Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Toribio Dominguez
Represented By: Sandra Ruvalcaba Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Garcia Santos
Represented By: Sandra Ruvalcaba Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Rosa
Represented By: Robert Lear Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Rosa Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Vlahandreas
Represented By: Robert Lear Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Mcallister
Represented By: Robert Lear Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Badger
Represented By: Robert Lear Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hank Schreeder
Represented By: Robert Lear Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Rosa Police Department
Represented By: Robert Lear Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?