Cummings v. Chevron Corporation et al
Petitioner: Donnie Cummings
Respondent: Chevron Corporation and Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv03895
Filed: June 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
2 Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 36 Receipt from San Francisco Superior Court Acknowleding Receipt of Remand Documents. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 4, 2018 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE Remanding Case to San Francisco Superior Court. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #11 Motion to Remand. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 33 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. and Donnie Cummings. (Maryott, Michele) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2018 Filing 32 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Brome, Daniel) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING ON #4 MOTION TO VACATE, #11 MOTION TO REMAND AND #24 MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION; CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2018 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2018 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
July 30, 2018 Filing 30 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Remand ) filed byDonnie Cummings. (Brome, Daniel) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 23, 2018 Filing 29 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Remand ) filed byChevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michele L. Maryott, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Michele L. Maryott)(Maryott, Michele) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
July 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award . Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2018 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 28 REPLY (re #4 MOTION to Vacate ) Arbitration Award filed byChevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of M. Maryott)(Maryott, Michele) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 27 Renotice motion hearing re #4 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award filed byChevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Maryott, Michele) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 26 Renotice motion hearing on #11 Motion to Remand filed by Donnie Cummings. (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 7/19/2018) Modified on 7/20/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Correct event is found under Civil Events > Motions and Related Filings > Other Supporting Documents > Re-notice motion. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety Re: #25 MOTION to Remand filed by Donnie Cummings. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 18, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2018 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 25 ***REPOSTING REQUIRED, DOCUMENT TO BE RE-FILED UNDER THE PROPER EVENT, RENOTICE OF MOTION*** MOTION to Remand filed by Donnie Cummings. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2018 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 8/1/2018. Replies due by 8/8/2018. (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 7/18/2018) Modified on 7/19/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Donnie Cummings. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2018 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 8/1/2018. Replies due by 8/8/2018. (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/10/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/17/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge James Donato no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RELATED CASE ORDER. The Court finds Cases C 16-2089 JSW and C 18-3895 JD related. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/16/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2018.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/16/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #4 MOTION to Vacate ) Arbitration Award filed byDonnie Cummings. (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 11, 2018 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc... (Maryott, Michele) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
July 11, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Maryott, Michele) (Filed on 7/11/2018) Modified on 7/12/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2018 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Donnie Cummings.. (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 10, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/17/2018. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 12 Reply in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award byDonnie Cummings. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit 15)(Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 7/9/2018) Modified on 7/10/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand filed by Donnie Cummings. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 7/23/2018. Replies due by 7/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit 16, #9 Proposed Order)(Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 3, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. re #9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Maryott, Michele) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
June 29, 2018 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
June 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal with Superior Court by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,(Maryott, Michele) (Filed on 6/29/2018) Modified on 7/2/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2018 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/13/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal,, #5 Opposition/Response to Motion, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 MOTION to Vacate (Maryott, Michele) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 5 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #4 MOTION to Vacate ) to Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award filed byChevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Maryott, Michele) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Vacate filed by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. Responses due by 7/12/2018. Replies due by 7/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michele L. Maryott, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Michele L. Maryott, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Michele L. Maryott, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Michele L. Maryott, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Michele L. Maryott, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Michele L. Maryott, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Michele L. Maryott, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Michele L. Maryott, #9 Proposed Order)(Maryott, Michele) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation, Other Affiliate Chevron Investments, Inc., Other Affiliate Chevron U.S.A. Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Texaco, Inc. for Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Maryott, Michele) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Cenergy International Services, L.L.C. for Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Maryott, Michele) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CPF-18-516232. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12473502). Filed byChevron U.S.A. Inc., Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michele L. Maryott, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Michele L. Maryott, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Michele L. Maryott, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Michele L. Maryott, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Michele L. Maryott, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Michele L. Maryott, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maryott, Michele) (Filed on 6/28/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cummings v. Chevron Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chevron Corporation
Represented By: Michele Leigh Maryott
Represented By: Catherine A. Conway
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Jesse A. Cripps, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Michele Leigh Maryott
Represented By: Catherine A. Conway
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Jesse A. Cripps, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donnie Cummings
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Represented By: Matthew C Helland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?