Board of Trustees, in their capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California et al v. Gurney

Plaintiff: Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees, in their capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California and Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Catherine S. Gurney
Case Number: 4:2018cv04204
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2018 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Board of Trustees, in their capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California re #11 Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default (Mainguy, Tracy) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 24, 2018 11 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT against Catherine S. Gurney, individually and doing business as Sierra Landscape & Maintenance on August 24, 2018. (Related documents(s) #8 )(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 23, 2018 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Board of Trustees, in their capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California re #8 MOTION for Entry of Default Request for Entry of Default by Clerk, #9 Declaration in Support,, (Mainguy, Tracy) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 9 Declaration of Tracy L. Mainguy in Support of #8 MOTION for Entry of Default Request for Entry of Default by Clerk filed byBoard of Trustees, in their capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Mainguy, Tracy) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 8 MOTION for Entry of Default Request for Entry of Default by Clerk filed by Board of Trustees, in their capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. (Mainguy, Tracy) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
July 24, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees, in their capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California. Catherine S. Gurney served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Lozano-Batista, Concepcion) (Filed on 7/24/2018)
July 17, 2018 6 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Board of Trustees, in their capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. (Lozano-Batista, Concepcion) (Filed on 7/17/2018) Modified on 7/18/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2018 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2018 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Catherine S. Gurney. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 13, 2018 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 2 Proposed Summons. (Mainguy, Tracy) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Damages, and Audit against Catherine S. Gurney ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12510708.). Filed byLaborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees, in their capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mainguy, Tracy) (Filed on 7/13/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees, in their capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California et al v. Gurney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine S. Gurney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, in their capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?