Kilbourne v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Mark W. Kilbourne
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv04619
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 130 Defendant Apple Inc.'s Response to #129 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Apple, Inc. (Prescott, Katherine) (Filed on 9/27/2018) Modified on 9/28/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2018 Filing 129 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Mark W. Kilbourne (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McArthur, Robert) (Filed on 9/12/2018) Modified on 9/13/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2018 Filing 128 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mark W. Kilbourne identifying Other Affiliate Mark W. Kilbourne, Other Affiliate Mr. Butller LLC for Mark W. Kilbourne. (McArthur, Robert) (Filed on 9/10/2018) Modified on 9/10/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #124 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for William Fred Hagans. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #125 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer Beth Rustay. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 125 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Jennifer Rustay (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12624751) filed by Mark W. Kilbourne. (Rustay, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/24/2018) Modified on 8/27/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2018 Filing 124 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: William Fred Hagans (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12624615) filed by Mark W. Kilbourne. (Hagans, William) (Filed on 8/24/2018) Modified on 8/27/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2018 Filing 123 Notice of Service of #115 Case Management Order by Mark W. Kilbourne. (McArthur, Robert) (Filed on 8/23/2018) Modified on 8/24/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2018 Filing 122 ANSWER to Amended Counterclaim, with jury demand, by Mark W. Kilbourne. (McArthur, Robert) (Filed on 8/23/2018) Modified on 8/24/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #119 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Robert J. McAughan, Jr. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Stephen McArthur (McArthur, Robert) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 119 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Robert J. McAughan, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12614890.) filed by Mark W. Kilbourne. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing for R. McAughan)(McAughan, Robert) (Filed on 8/22/2018) Modified on 8/23/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #117 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer P. Nock. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 117 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jennifer P. Nock ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12607966.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Nock, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #113 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Joseph A. Hynds. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/16/18.Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/26/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/15/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 113 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Joseph A. Hynds ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12595438.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Hynds, Joseph) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 14, 2018 Filing 112 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 14, 2018 Filing 111 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc... (Prescott, Katherine) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 110 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Apple Inc., Other Affiliate Assa Abloy Inc., Other Affiliate ASSA ABLOY AB, Other Affiliate August Home, Inc. for Apple, Inc.. (Prescott, Katherine) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 109 Answer to Amended Complaint #28 Amended Complaint Defendant Apple Inc.'s First Amended Answer and, COUNTERCLAIM to First Amended Complaint against Mark W. Kilbourne byApple, Inc.. (Prescott, Katherine) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine D. Prescott (Prescott, Katherine) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 107 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/15/2018. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 106 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 105 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:17-cv-03283. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 8/1/2018 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Northern District of California (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Northern District of California; GRANTED (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #101 Motion to Amend.Mr. Kilbourne need not respond to Apples Answer and Counterclaims (Dkt.97);Apple will file an Amended Answer and Counterclaims by August 2, 2018; andMr. Kilbourne will file a response to Apples Amended Answer andCounterclaims within fourteen (14) days after Apples filing of the same.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
July 26, 2018 Filing 101 Joint MOTION to Amend by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hynds, Joseph)
July 16, 2018 Filing 100 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
July 9, 2018 Filing 99 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
July 9, 2018 Filing 98 SURREPLY to #29 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, filed by Mark W. Kilbourne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Appendix Copendium of Cases to Sur-Reply, #7 Unredacted attachment 1, #8 Unredacted attachment 2, #9 Unredacted attachment 3, #10 Unredacted attachment 4)(McAughan, Robert)
July 5, 2018 Filing 97 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Mark W. Kilbourne by Apple Inc., filed.(Hynds, Joseph)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #95 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Apple Inc. 7/5/2018.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
June 19, 2018 Filing 95 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer, Move, or Respond to First Amended Complaint by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hynds, Joseph)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Joint Order Regarding Schedule for Motion to Transfer and Stay of Discovery. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
June 14, 2018 Filing 93 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Schedule for Motion to Transfer and Stay of Discovery re: #87 Minute Entry Order,,,,, filed.(Hynds, Joseph)
June 14, 2018 Filing 92 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #91 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dhansen, 4)
June 13, 2018 Filing 91 TRANSCRIPT re: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/7/18 before Judge Nancy F Atlas. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JOHN LANE Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2018., filed. (thudson, )
June 11, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn A. Fulkerson on behalf of Apple Inc., filed. (Fulkerson, Kathryn)
June 7, 2018 Filing 89 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Steve Vacek for Transcript of 6/7/2018. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (ShoshanaArnow, 4)Electronically forwarded to Exceptional Reporting, see docket entry #88 on 6/8/2018. Estimated completion date 6/15/2018. Modified on 6/8/2018 (ShoshanaArnow, 4).
June 7, 2018 Filing 88 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by John Lane/Apple for Transcript of Status Conference, 6/7/2018, Judge Atlas. 3-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Lane, John)Electronically forwarded to Exceptional Reporting on 6/8/2018. Estimated completion date 6/13/2018. Modified on 6/8/2018 (ShoshanaArnow, 4).
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Status held Appearances: Rhuju Vasavada. Appearances: John Ricardo Lane, Joseph A Hynds, Jennifer Nock, Matthew Charles Zorn, William Fred Hagans, Robert J McAughan, Jr. Ct Reporter: ERO. Motion to Strike the Untimely Johnson Declaration in support of Apple Incs motion totransfer [Doc. # 68] is DENIED in accordance with the record in open court.Plaintiff is allowed to take the deposition of Mr. Johnson (with August) within the next fewweeks (3 hour time limit).Parties to discuss and inform the Court within a few days regarding a revised briefingschedule on the the Motion to Transfer ( 10 page limit for Plaintiff and 7 page limit forDefendant, all with 13 pt. font and 1 inch margins).Motion to Dismiss [Doc. # 35] is DENIED without prejudice in accordance with the recordin open court. Any future motions on the subject must be made under Fed. Rule Civ. Pro. 56(summary judgment). Claim construction of the threshold claim term will occur after a rulingon the Motion to Transfer.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) (Main Document 87 replaced on 6/7/2018) (sashabranner, 4).
June 6, 2018 Filing 86 STATUS REPORT by Mark W. Kilbourne, filed.(McAughan, Robert)
June 5, 2018 Filing 85 PROPOSED ORDER re: #83 Sealed Event, filed.(Hynds, Joseph)
June 5, 2018 Filing 84 APPENDIX re: #83 Sealed Event by Apple Inc., filed.(Hynds, Joseph)
June 5, 2018 Filing 83 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
June 5, 2018 Filing 82 NOTICE /Mr. Kilbourne's Request for Oral Argument and Notice of Argument by Junior Attorneys re: #29 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, #68 Sealed Event by Mark W. Kilbourne, filed. (McAughan, Robert)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying #59 Motion to Compel Responses to Venue Interrogatory No. 1.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(bmendoza, 5)
June 4, 2018 Filing 80 APPENDIX re: #79 Sealed Event by Apple Inc., filed.(Hynds, Joseph)
June 4, 2018 Filing 79 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
June 4, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 6/7/2018 at 11:30 AM (TIME CHANGE ONLY) in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas, filed. (sashabranner, 4)
May 29, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Rhuju Vasavada on behalf of Mark W. Kilbourne, filed. (McAughan, Robert)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER setting Status Conference for 6/7/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Nancy F Atlas.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(TDR, 4)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Frances Stacy(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) Modified on 5/29/2018 (sashabranner, 4).
May 25, 2018 Filing 74 REPLY Brief Early Claim Construction for the Claim Term "Reversible Elongated Member", filed by Apple Inc.. (Hynds, Joseph)
May 25, 2018 Filing 73 BRIEF RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF FOR THE TERM REVERSIBLE ELONGATED MEMBER by Mark W. Kilbourne, filed.(McAughan, Robert)
May 23, 2018 Filing 72 DECLARATION of Jennifer Nock re: #71 Sealed Event, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3)(Nock, Jennifer)
May 23, 2018 Filing 71 Sealed Event, filed.
May 23, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Nancy F Atlas pursuant to General Order 2018-07, filed. (rwestmoreland, 4)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Melinda Harmon recused. Case reassigned to Judge Kenneth M Hoyt for all further proceedings(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #66 Motion to Extend Venue Related Deadlines..(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
May 16, 2018 Filing 68 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
May 16, 2018 Filing 67 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
May 14, 2018 Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION Motion to Extend Venue Deadlines by Mark W. Kilbourne, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zorn, Matthew)
May 11, 2018 Filing 65 BRIEF Opening Early Claim Construction Brief for the Claim Term "Reversible Elongated Member" by Apple Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Hynds, Joseph)
May 11, 2018 Filing 64 BRIEF /Mr. Kilbourne's Early Claim Construction Brief for the Term "Reversible Elongated Member" by Mark W. Kilbourne, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McAughan, Robert)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER AND OPINION, denying without prejudice #46 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of its Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer, #29 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
May 7, 2018 Filing 62 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
May 7, 2018 Filing 61 SUPPLEMENT to #29 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California by Apple Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 [SEALED], #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Proposed Order)(Hynds, Joseph)
May 3, 2018 Filing 60 Sealed Event, filed.
May 3, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION to Compel Responses to Venue Interrogatory No. 1 by Mark W. Kilbourne, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [SEALED])(McAughan, Robert)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
April 27, 2018 Filing 57 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #56 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
April 26, 2018 Filing 56 TRANSCRIPT re: Initial Conference held on April 17, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party Steven Vacek Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2018., filed. (mahenry, )
April 24, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE of Agreed Protective Order by Mark W. Kilbourne, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McAughan, Robert)
April 23, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by William Fred Hagans and Jennifer Rustay on behalf of Mark W. Kilbourne, filed. (Hagans, William)
April 18, 2018 Filing 53 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by John Lane/Apple for Transcript of Scheduling Conference on 4/17/18 before Magistrate Judge Stacy. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (Lane, John) Electronically forwarded to Judicial Transcribers on 4/18/2018. Estimated completion date 4/25/2018 Modified on 4/18/2018 (ShoshanaArnow, 4).
April 17, 2018 Filing 52 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Steven Vacek for Transcript of Status hearing held 4/17/2018 before the Honorable Frances Stacy. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (jdav, 4) Electronically forwarded to Judicial Transcribers on 4/18/2018. Estimated completion date 4/25/2018. Modified on 4/18/2018 (ShoshanaArnow, 4).
April 17, 2018 Filing 51 Schedule for Preliminary Venue Discovery and Claim Construction. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 EARLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. All discovery is stayed until 7/16/2018 to permit the Court to decide the construction issue. Opening briefs due by 5/11/2018. Reply briefs due by 5/25/2018.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
April 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 4/17/2018. Early Claim Construction Schedule entered. Scheduling Conference reset for 9/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. Appearances: John Ricardo Lane, Joseph A Hynds, Jennifer Nock, Matthew Charles Zorn, Robert J McAughan, Jr.(Court Reporter: ERO)(Digital # 10:11-10:47)(ERO:J. Olson), filed.(gclair, 4)
April 17, 2018 Filing 49 Corrected RESPONSE to #46 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of its Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer filed by Mark W. Kilbourne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order)(McAughan, Robert)
April 17, 2018 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition to #46 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of its Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer, filed by Mark W. Kilbourne. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Correspondence, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Correspondence, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Correspondence, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Correspondence, #6 Exhibit Mandamus Petition)(Zorn, Matthew)
April 13, 2018 Filing 46 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of its Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hynds, Joseph)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing #31 MOTION Propound Expedited Venue Discovery.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
April 9, 2018 Filing 45 RESPONSE to #35 MOTION to Dismiss #28 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. filed by Mark W. Kilbourne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Appendix Appendix of Unreported Cases, #10 Unredacted attachment, #11 Unredacted attachment, #12 Unredacted attachment, #13 Unredacted attachment, #14 Unredacted attachment, #15 Unredacted attachment, #16 Unredacted attachment, #17 Unredacted attachment, #18 Unredacted attachment, #19 Unredacted attachment, #20 Unredacted attachment, #21 Unredacted attachment, #22 Unredacted attachment, #23 Unredacted attachment, #24 Unredacted attachment, #25 Unredacted attachment, #26 Unredacted attachment)(McAughan, Robert)
April 6, 2018 Filing 44 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Mark W. Kilbourne, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E)(Zorn, Matthew)
April 4, 2018 Filing 43 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Apple Inc., filed.(Hynds, Joseph)
April 4, 2018 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #31 MOTION Propound Expedited Venue Discovery by Mark W. Kilbourne, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McAughan, Robert)
April 4, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Stipulation re: Dkt. No. 31 re: #31 MOTION Propound Expedited Venue Discovery by Mark W. Kilbourne, filed. (McAughan, Robert)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Transfer..(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
March 28, 2018 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition to #29 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, filed by Mark W. Kilbourne. (Zorn, Matthew)
March 23, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Frances H. Stacy re #31 MOTION Propound Expedited Venue Discovery, filed. (jdav, 4)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM .(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
March 19, 2018 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hynds, Joseph)
March 19, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss #28 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit J. Nock, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 1 of 2, #3 Exhibit 1 Part 2 of 2, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Proposed Order)(Hynds, Joseph)
March 16, 2018 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Transfer by Mark W. Kilbourne, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McAughan, Robert)
March 16, 2018 Filing 33 STATEMENT re: #32 Notice (Other) by Apple Inc., filed.(Hynds, Joseph)
March 14, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE Non-Response re: #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Mark W. Kilbourne, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(McAughan, Robert)
March 14, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION Propound Expedited Venue Discovery by Mark W. Kilbourne, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order)(McAughan, Robert) Clerk's Note: This motion is WITHDRAWN per order at entry 47 and has been terminated
March 12, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Frances H. Stacy re #29 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, filed. (jdav, 4)
March 7, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of M. Jaynes, #2 Affidavit of J. Johnson, #3 Affidavit of J Nock, #4 Proposed Order)(Hynds, Joseph)
March 5, 2018 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. filed by Mark W. Kilbourne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McAughan, Robert)
March 5, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Zorn on behalf of Mark W. Kilbourne, filed. (McAughan, Robert)
March 1, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Fred Hagans and Jennifer B. Rustay on behalf of Mark W. Kilbourne, filed. (McAughan, Robert)
February 28, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Nock Decl and Exhibit 1 (part 1), #2 Exhibit 1 (part 2), #3 Proposed Order)(Lane, John)
February 26, 2018 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mark W. Kilbourne, filed.(McAughan, Robert)
February 26, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 4/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy, filed. (bwhite, 4)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Jennifer Nock to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Joseph A. Hynds to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
February 23, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Frances H. Stacy re #19 Joint MOTION to Reset Initial Case Conference, filed. (rhawkins)
February 22, 2018 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Reset Initial Case Conference by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lane, John)
February 22, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert J. McAughan, Jr., counsel for Mark W. Kilbourne, filed. (McAughan, Robert)
February 20, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Jennifer Nock to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2018. (Lane, John)
February 20, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Joseph A. Hynds to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2018. (Lane, John)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time, the time for defendant Apple, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to and including February 28, 2018..(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
January 29, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jackob Ben-Ezra on behalf of Apple Inc., filed. (Ben-Ezra, Jackob)
January 22, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer, Move, or Respond to Complaint by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lane, John)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to David Terrell..(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
December 15, 2017 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for David Terrell to Withdraw as Attorney by Mark W. Kilbourne, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Terrell, David)
November 29, 2017 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Apple Inc. served on 11/9/2017, filed.(McAughan, Robert)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time, Response date is extended to January 29, 2018..(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins, 4)
November 22, 2017 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apple Inc., filed.(Lane, John)
November 22, 2017 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Apple Inc., filed.(Lane, John)
November 21, 2017 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer, Move or Respond to Complaint by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lane, John)
November 21, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Lane on behalf of Apple Inc., filed. (Lane, John)
October 31, 2017 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hler, 4)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
October 31, 2017 Filing 3 Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks, AO-120, Notified, filed. (ckrus, 4)
October 30, 2017 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Apple Inc., filed.(McAughan, Robert)
October 30, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-19129139) filed by Mark W. Kilbourne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McAughan, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kilbourne v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Fulkerson
Represented By: Joseph A. Hynds
Represented By: John Ricardo Lane
Represented By: Jennifer Nock
Represented By: Jackob Ben-Ezra
Represented By: Jennifer Phend Nock
Represented By: Katherine D. Prescott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark W. Kilbourne
Represented By: Robert J McAughan, Jr
Represented By: Matthew Charles Zorn
Represented By: William Fred Hagans
Represented By: Robert James McAughan
Represented By: Robert Stephen McArthur
Represented By: Matthew C Zorn
Represented By: Jennifer Beth Rustay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?