Lantz Jackson v. U.S. Court of Appeals

Petitioner: Lantz Jackson
Respondent: US Court of Appeals
Case Number: 4:2018cv04758
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sacramento
0 Judge: PSLC JNE
1 Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2018 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lantz Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 9, 2018 6 CLERK'S NOTICE to Petitioner: That case has been transferred to the Northern District of California (Oakland) (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 5 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-02090. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 7, 2018 7 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/14/2018. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 6, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Lantz Jackson. (Henshaw, R)
August 6, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/6/2018 ORDERING CASE TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. (Henshaw, R)
August 1, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Lantz Jackson. (York, M)
August 1, 2018 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (York, M)
August 1, 2018 1 USCA ORDER as to No. 18-71638 filed by Lantz Jackson. The court is in receipt of petitioner's original petition for a writ of habeas corpus, which appears to be filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. An application for a writ of habeas corpus must be made to the district court. If a petition for writ of habeas corpus is filed in the court of appeals, the application must be transferred to the appropriate district court. Accordingly, the Clerk shall transfer the petition to the US District Court for the Eastern District of California. (York, M)
June 5, 2018 2 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against U.S. Court of Appeals by Lantz Jackson. (York, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lantz Jackson v. U.S. Court of Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Court of Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lantz Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?