United States of America v. Walter James Kubon, et al.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: State of California Franchise Tax Board, Walter James Kubon and Vally Kubon
Case Number: 4:2018cv04788
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 17 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS/COUNTERCLAIMANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants/Counterclaimants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/9/2018. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 20, 2018 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS/COUNTERCLAIMANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants/Counterclaimants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2018. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 20, 2018 Filing 15 Memorandum of Law in Support of #14 MOTION to Dismiss Motion To Dismiss Counterclaim filed by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/4/2018. Replies due by 10/11/2018. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 9/20/2018) Modified on 9/20/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss #10 Counterclaim filed by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/4/2018. Replies due by 10/11/2018. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 9/20/2018) Modified on 9/21/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct event is "Memorandum in Support." Event can be found under Civil Events > Motions and Related Filings > Other Supporting Documents. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #15 Memorandum of Law in Support of #14 MOTION to Dismiss Motion To Dismiss Counterclaim Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Counterclaim filed by United States of America (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Walter James Kubon. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2018: #1 Envelope) (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS/COUNTERCLAIMANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants/Counterclaimants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/21/2018. (igS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America byVally Kubon, Walter James Kubon. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #6 Summons Issued, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/6/2018. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Vally Kubon, Walter James Kubon, State of California Franchise Tax Board. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/22/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 ***PDF ERROR, RE-filed as Docket no. #3 *** Proposed Summons. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 8/8/2018) Modified on 8/9/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 8/8/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Walter James Kubon, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California Franchise Tax Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter James Kubon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vally Kubon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Cynthia Lewis Stier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?