Fremont Bank v. Signorelli et al

Plaintiff: Fremont Bank
Defendant: Kathryn R Signorelli, Robert J Signorelli and Singorelli Family, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2018cv04808
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2018 24 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION for Right to Attach Order, Issuance of Writ of Attachment, and Temporary Protective Order Against Defendants Robert J. Signorelli, Kathryn R. Signorelli, Signorelli Family Living Trust, and Signorelli Family, L.P. : Responses due by 10/22/2018 and Replies due by 10/29/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 28, 2018 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fremont Bank As To: Signorelli Family, L.P. (Williams, Kristin) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fremont Bank As To: Kathryn R. Signorelli, Trustee of the Signorelli Family Living Trust, dated April 8, 1994, amended February 28, 2001, November 22, 2005 and January 5 (Williams, Kristin) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fremont Bank As To: Robert J. Signorelli, Individually and as Trustee of the Signorelli Family Living Trust, Dated April 8, 1994 amended February 28, 2001 (Williams, Kristin) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fremont Bank As To: Robert J. Signorelli, Individually (Williams, Kristin) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Fremont Bank. (Williams, Kristin) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 13, 2018 Reset Hearing/Deadlines as to Docket No. #13 Pursuant to Docket No. #18 : Responses due by 9/14/2018; Replies due by 9/21/2018; Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 12, 2018 18 Re-notice re #13 MOTION for Right to Attach Order, Issuance of Writ of Attachment, and Temporary Protective Order Against Defendants Robert J. Signorelli, Kathryn R. Signorelli, Signorelli Family Living Trust, and Signorelli Family, L.P. filed by Fremont Bank. (Williams, Kristin) (Filed on 9/12/2018) Modified on 9/13/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2018 17 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re-file the #13 motion for right to attach order, issuance of writ of attachment, and temporary protective order. Hearing date of October 11, 2018, is vacated. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. October 11th was not the Court's next available hearing when this motion was e-filed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
August 31, 2018 16 **DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR ** Request for Judicial Notice re #15 MOTION For Right to Attach Order, Issuance of Writ of Attachment, and Temporary Protective Order AGainst Defendants Robert J. Signorelli, Kathryn R. Signorelli, Signorelli Family Living Trust, and Signorelli Family, L.P. filed byFremont Bank. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Williams, Kristin) (Filed on 8/31/2018) Modified on 9/5/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2018 15 ** DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR** MOTION For Right to Attach Order, Issuance of Writ of Attachment, and Temporary Protective Order AGainst Defendants Robert J. Signorelli, Kathryn R. Signorelli, Signorelli Family Living Trust, and Signorelli Family, L.P. filed by Fremont Bank. Responses due by 9/14/2018. Replies due by 9/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Fremont Bank's Motion for Right to Attach Order, Issuance of Writ of Attachment, and Temporary Protective Order Against Defendants Robert J. Signorelli, Kathryn R. Signorelli, Signorelli Family Living Trust, and Signorelli Family, L.P., #2 Declaration of Catherine Silzle in Support of Fremont Bank's Motion for Right to Attach Order, Issuance of Writ of Attachment, and Temporary Protective Order Against Defendants Robert J. Signorelli, Kathryn R. Signorelli, Signorelli Family Living Trust, and Signorelli Family, L.P., #3 Plaintiff Fremont Bank's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Right to Attach Order, Issuance of Writ of Attachment, And Temporary Protective Order Against Defendants Robert J. Signorelli, Kathryn R. Signorelli, Signorelli Family Living Trust, and Signorelli Family, L.P.)(Williams, Kristin) (Filed on 8/31/2018) Modified on 9/5/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/5/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2018 14 Request for Judicial Notice re #13 MOTION for Right to Attach Order, Issuance of Writ of Attachment, and Temporary Protective Order Against Defendants Robert J. Signorelli, Kathryn R. Signorelli, Signorelli Family Living Trust, and Signorelli Family, L.P. filed byFremont Bank. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Williams, Kristin) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 13 MOTION for Right to Attach Order, Issuance of Writ of Attachment, and Temporary Protective Order Against Defendants Robert J. Signorelli, Kathryn R. Signorelli, Signorelli Family Living Trust, and Signorelli Family, L.P. filed by Fremont Bank. Responses due by 9/14/2018. Replies due by 9/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Right to Attach Order, Issuance of Writ of Attachment and Temporary Protective Order Against Defendants Robert J. Signorelli, Kathryn R. Signorelli, Signorelli Family Living Trust, and Signorelli Family, L.P., #2 Declaration Of Catherine Silzle in Support of Fremont Bank's Motion for Right to Attach Order, Issuance of Writ of Attachment, and Temporary Protective Order Against Defendants Robert J. Signorelli, Kathryn R. Signorelli, Signorelli Family Living Trust, and Signorelli Family, L.P.)(Williams, Kristin) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 29, 2018 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for November 13, 2018, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by November 6, 2018. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:18-cv-04808-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 28, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on August 28, 2018. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 28, 2018 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 27, 2018 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fremont Bank.. (Williams, Kristin) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 27, 2018 8 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/10/2018. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 10, 2018 7 Summons Issued as to Kathryn R Signorelli, Robert J Signorelli, Singorelli Family, L.P. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 9, 2018 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/23/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 8, 2018 4 Proposed Summons. (Williams, Kristin) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 3 Proposed Summons. (Williams, Kristin) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 2 Proposed Summons. (Williams, Kristin) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 1 COMPLAINT of Fremont Bank for Breach of Written Contract and Breach of Written Guaranty against Kathryn R Signorelli, Robert J Signorelli, Singorelli Family, L.P. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12579882.). Filed byFremont Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Kristin) (Filed on 8/8/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fremont Bank v. Signorelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn R Signorelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Signorelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singorelli Family, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fremont Bank
Represented By: Kristin Louise Williams
Represented By: Jeffrey Bruce Kirschenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?