Bowie v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Frank Leroy Bowie
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 4:2018cv04889
Filed: August 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nancy A. Berryhill.. (Clark, Carol) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT re #8 USM-285. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Berryhill, #2 USM-285 USA, #3 USM-285 USAG)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)***(correction of document #6 ***
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 ***DISREGARD. RE-FILED AT DKT. #8 ***Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM-285 - Berryhill, #2 USM-285 - USA, #3 USM-285 - USAG)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018) Modified on 8/27/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Clerk to issue Summons and US Marshal serve. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Please docket your Motion for Informa Pauperis and Consent/Declination for Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction as separate docket entries. Thank you. Re: #1 C omplaint filed by Frank Leroy Bowie (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 12, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Frank Leroy Bowie.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2018)
August 12, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Frank Leroy Bowie. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2018)
August 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill. Filed byFrank Leroy Bowie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application to Proceed IFP, #3 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(Campbell, Alexxander) (Filed on 8/12/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowie v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Leroy Bowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Carol S. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?