Zomm, LLC v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Zomm, LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv04969
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Apple Inc. Filed by Zomm, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zinna, Michael) (Filed on 10/3/2018) Modified on 10/4/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to of David G. Lindenbaum.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to of Whitney M. Smith. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of David G. Lindenbaum ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12660135.) filed by Zomm, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lindenbaum, David) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Whitney M. Smith ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12658785.) filed by Zomm, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Smith, Whitney) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 32 Certificate of Interested Entities by Zomm, LLC (Zinna, Michael) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Zinna. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Hannah Y. Chanoine. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Hale Dubin (Dubin, Andrew) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by David Edward Fink (Fink, David) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Scott Brenner (Brenner, Lee) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Zinna ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12655156.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/6/2018 filed by Zomm, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Zinna, Michael) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Application for Admission of Hannah Y. Chanoine Pro Hac Vice (Civil Local Rule 11-3) and [Proposed] Order) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12643544.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Chanoine, Hannah) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for November 27, 2018, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by November 20, 2018. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:18-cv-04969-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/30/18. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 29, 2018 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 29, 2018 Filing 21 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc... (Simmons, Luann) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 29, 2018 Filing 20 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Apple Inc. (Simmons, Luann) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 29, 2018 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Simmons, Luann) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 29, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Sina Sean Aria (Aria, Sina) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 29, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Eberhart (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 29, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Luann Loraine Simmons (Simmons, Luann) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 15 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 14 CASE TRANSFERRED in from United States District Court for the Southern District of New York; Case Number 1:18-cv-03534-ER. Original File Certified Copy of Transfer Order and Docket Sheet Received. Modified on 8/17/2018 (tnS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of California (ne)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, subject to the approval of the Court,that:1. Venue is proper in and this case should be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California; and 2. Zomm's deadline to file a First Amended Complaint in the Northern District of California is 60 days after the case is docketed in the Northern District of California; and 3. Apple's deadline to respond to the Complaint is stayed until 60 days after Zomm files its First Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/10/2018) (ne)
August 9, 2018 Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Zomm, LLC. (Zinna, Michael)
July 23, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Apple Inc. waiver sent on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. Document filed by Zomm, LLC. (Zinna, Michael)
July 19, 2018 Filing 10 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (laq)
April 24, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Apple Inc. (laq) (laq).
April 24, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (laq)
April 24, 2018 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (laq)
April 24, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (laq)
April 23, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Francis Ward on behalf of Zomm, LLC. (Ward, John)
April 23, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Whitney Morgan Smith on behalf of Zomm, LLC. (Smith, Whitney)
April 23, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Lindenbaum on behalf of Zomm, LLC. (Lindenbaum, David)
April 23, 2018 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Zinna, Michael)
April 23, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Apple Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Zomm, LLC. (Zinna, Michael)
April 23, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Zomm, LLC.(Zinna, Michael)
April 23, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zinna, Michael)
April 23, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Apple Inc. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Zomm, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Zinna, Michael)
April 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14977292) Document filed by Zomm, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A)(Zinna, Michael)
April 23, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Michael Jay Zinna. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
April 23, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael Jay Zinna to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 4/30/2018. (jgo)
April 20, 2018 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (laq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zomm, LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zomm, LLC
Represented By: David Lindenbaum
Represented By: Michael Jay Zinna
Represented By: Whitney Morgan Smith
Represented By: John Francis Ward
Represented By: Michael J. Zinna
Represented By: Lee Scott Brenner
Represented By: Andrew Hale Dubin
Represented By: David Edward Fink
Represented By: John Francis Ward,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Luann Loraine Simmons
Represented By: Sina Sean Aria
Represented By: Hannah Y. Chanoine
Represented By: David R. Eberhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?