Facebook, Inc. v. BlackBerry Limited et al Featured Case

Facebook has filed a lawsuit against BlackBerry alleging patent infringement over several patents related to voice messaging. Earlier this year, Blackberry filed a lawsuit against Facebook over voice messaging software, as well.

Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Defendant: BlackBerry Corporation and BlackBerry Limited
Case Number: 4:2018cv05434
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 60 DECLARATION OF JONATHAN TSE IN SUPPORT OF BLACKBERRYS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS re 59 Opposition/Response to Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by BlackBerry Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Related document(s) 59 ) (Lordgooei, Iman) (Filed on 8/16/2019) Modified on 8/19/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2019 Filing 59 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions ) filed byBlackBerry Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Jonathan Tse)(Lordgooei, Iman) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 58 Facebook, Inc.'s Reply Claim Construction Brief by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Benjamin S. Lin, # 2 Exhibit 4)(Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 8/15/2019) Modified on 8/16/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Report and Recommendation. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 57 Declaration of Jonathan Tse in Support of 52 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Facebook's Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions filed byBlackBerry Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motion (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit I (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit J (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit K (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit L (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit M (Redacted), # 7 Exhibit N (Redacted))(Related document(s) 52 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REFERRING 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions to a randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/12/19. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 54 Stipulation Extending Deadline to File Declaration in Support of 52 Motion to Seal. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 54 Joint Stipulation Extending Deadline to File Declaration in Support of 52 Motion to Seal filed by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Facebook, Inc. (Lordgooei, Iman) (Filed on 8/6/2019) Modified on 8/7/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 8/16/2019. Replies due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Benjamin S. Lin, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 52 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Zambarda, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted version of Facebook's Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 4 Unredacted version of Facebook's Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 5 Redacted version of Exhibit I, # 6 Unredacted version of Exhibit I, # 7 Redacted version of Exhibit J, # 8 Unredacted version of Exhibit J, # 9 Redacted version of Exhibit K, # 10 Unredacted version of Exhibit K, # 11 Redacted version of Exhibit L, # 12 Unredacted version of Exhibit L, # 13 Redacted version of Exhibit M, # 14 Unredacted version of Exhibit M, # 15 Redacted version of Exhibit N, # 16 Unredacted version of Exhibit N)(Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 51 BlackBerry's Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. Matthew B. Shoemake, # 2 Declaration of Iman Lordgooei, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K)(Lordgooei, Iman) (Filed on 8/1/2019) Modified on 8/7/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Sze Ming Tse (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 49 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Facebook Inc.'s Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Declaration Dr. Robert Akl)(Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 48 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 4-3 filed by Facebook, Inc., BlackBerry Limited, BlackBerry Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 6/20/2019) Modified on 6/21/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 46 STIPULATION to Extend Claim Construction Deadlines. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/31/19. Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/24/2019 10:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 10/3/2019 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Claim Construction Deadlines filed by Facebook, Inc., BlackBerry Limited, BlackBerry Corporation. (Mead, Lowell) (Filed on 5/24/2019) Modified on 5/28/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 44 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (L.R. 4-3). (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 24, 2019 Filing 44 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadline for Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (L.R. 4-3) [Proposed] filed by Facebook, Inc., BlackBerry Limited, BlackBerry Corporation. (Mead, Lowell) (Filed on 4/24/2019) Modified on 4/25/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Charles Riopelle for Blackberry Limited and Blackberry Corporation (Riopelle, Brian) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Sartouk Moussavi. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Sartouk H. Moussavi (Filing fee $310, receipt number 0971-13267375) filed by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Moussavi, Sartouk) (Filed on 4/17/2019) Modified on 4/18/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2019 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The Correct Event can be Found under Motions>Pro Hac Vice. Please complete the Form Available from the Court's We b Site and Attach a Certificate of Good Standing. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 40 Notice of Appearance filed by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 40 ***WRONG EVENT USED, CORRECT EVENT IS PRO HAC VICE MOTION, DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED*** NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Anthony Parks. (Parks, Michael) (Filed on 4/16/2019) Modified on 4/17/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2019 Filing 39 STIPULATED ORDER GOVERNING THE PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION [PROPOSED] by Facebook, Inc., BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Mead, Lowell) (Filed on 2/5/2019) Modified on 2/6/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Iman Lordgooei (Lordgooei, Iman) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 37 Notice of Withdrawal of Ian S. Shelton as Counsel of Record for Defendants and Counterclaimants BlackBerry Limited and BlackBerry Corporation by Ian Scott Shelton. (Shelton, Ian) (Filed on 1/18/2019) Modified on 1/22/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/18/19. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 35 [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order filed by Facebook, Inc. (Mead, Lowell) (Filed on 1/17/2019) Modified on 1/18/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 33 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 33 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Facebook, Inc. filed by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Shelton, Ian) (Filed on 12/17/2018) Modified on 12/17/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Ross Jaffe (Jaffe, Jordan) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINES FOR CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION AND DAMAGES CONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/11/18. Tutorial Hearing set for 9/5/2019 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. Claims Construction Hearing set for 9/19/2019 10:00 AM. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 30 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 26(F) filed by Facebook, Inc., BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 12/7/2018) Modified on 12/7/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2018 Filing 29 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim byFacebook, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 28 STIPULATION to extend deadlines filed by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Facebook, Inc. (Mishra, Pushkal) (Filed on 11/30/2018) Modified on 12/3/20,18 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Pushkal Mishra as counsel of record for Defendants and Counterclaimants BlackBerry Limited and BlackBerry Corporation (Mishra, Pushkal) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Scott Shelton as counsel of record for Defendants and Counterclaimants BlackBerry Limited and BlackBerry Corporation (Shelton, Ian) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 23, 2018 Filing 25 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by BlackBerry Limited and BlackBerry Corporation (Kapgan, Yury) (Filed on 11/23/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 24 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Caplan, Matthew) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE Withdrawing Edward R. McGah, Jr. as Counsel of Record in this Action by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Kapgan, Yury) (Filed on 11/15/2018) Modified on 11/16/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE designating James R. Asperger as their lead counsel in this action by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Kapgan, Yury) (Filed on 11/13/2018) Modified on 11/14/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2018 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited (Kapgan, Yury) (Filed on 11/12/2018)
November 12, 2018 Filing 20 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited (Kapgan, Yury) (Filed on 11/12/2018)
November 12, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Facebook, Inc. byBlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Kapgan, Yury) (Filed on 11/12/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc., BlackBerry Limited, Blackberry Corporation. (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 9/25/2018) Modified on 9/26/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Sung-Ping Lin as Counsel for Plaintiff Facebook, Inc. (Lin, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Anthony Zambarda (Zambarda, Mark) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Caplan (Caplan, Matthew) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/19/18. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 9/18/18. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Facebook, Inc... (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 10 Refund Status re #7 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 26C1SQ8A by Facebook, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/18/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Facebook, Inc. (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12650708.). Filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12650708.). Filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 9/4/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facebook, Inc. v. BlackBerry Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlackBerry Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlackBerry Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi Lyn Keefe
Represented By: Mark R. Weinstein
Represented By: Benjamin S. Lin
Represented By: Matthew David Caplan
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Mark Anthony Zambarda
Represented By: Matthew J. Brigham
Represented By: Lowell D. Mead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?