Dunne v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Shane Dunne
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2018cv05484
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 11 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byShane Dunne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Dunne, Shane) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #9 Plaintiff's Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Shane Dunne. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shane Dunne. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/5/2018. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT as to #5 Summons Issued as to USA. (jjb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285, #2 USM-285)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND ORDER OF SERVICE by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: The Clerk shall issue summons, and the U.S. Marshal for the Northern District of California serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the complaint, and other documents specified by the Clerk, plaintiff's affidavit and this order upon the defendant(s). (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shane Dunne. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2018 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America. Filed by Shane Dunne. Consent/Declination due by 9/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunne v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?