MPH Technologies Oy v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: MPH Technologies Oy
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv05935
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/17/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a U.S. District Court Judge. Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 10/17/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 17, 2018 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 16, 2018 Filing 34 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc... (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 16, 2018 Filing 33 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Apple, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 13, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MPH Technologies Oy re #1 Complaint, (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 10/13/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Rudolph Kim (Kim, Rudolph) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin L. Brewer (Brewer, Robin) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Stefani Elise Shanberg (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 9, 2018 Filing 28 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by MPH Technologies Oy.. (Haan, Brian) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Richard B. Megley, Jr.). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (David J. Sheikh). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Dragan Gjorgiev). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Christopher J. Lee).(vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Brian E. Haan).(vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Ashley E. LaValley). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Richard B. Megley, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12718051.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/27/2018 filed by MPH Technologies Oy. (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for David J. Sheikh ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12718012.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/27/2018 filed by MPH Technologies Oy. (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Dragan Gjorgiev ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12717991.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/27/2018 filed by MPH Technologies Oy. (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Christopher J. Lee ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12717960.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/27/2018 filed by MPH Technologies Oy. (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Brian E. Haan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12717931.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/27/2018 filed by MPH Technologies Oy. (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Ashley E. LaValley ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12717850.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/27/2018 filed by MPH Technologies Oy. (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 15 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patents (cc: form mailed to register). (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #3 #4 #5 #6 #7 #8 Motions for Pro Hac Vice. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by MPH Technologies Oy (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 12 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/12/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Richard B. Megley, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12718051.) filed by MPH Technologies Oy. (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for David J. Sheikh ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12718012.) filed by MPH Technologies Oy. (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Dragan Gjorgiev ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12717991.) filed by MPH Technologies Oy. (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Christopher J. Lee ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12717960.) filed by MPH Technologies Oy. (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Brian E. Haan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12717931.) filed by MPH Technologies Oy. (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Ashley E. LaValley ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12717850.) filed by MPH Technologies Oy. (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12716748.). Filed byMPH Technologies Oy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 9/27/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MPH Technologies Oy v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Stefani Elise Shanberg
Represented By: Rudolph Kim
Represented By: Robin L. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MPH Technologies Oy
Represented By: Patricia L. Peden
Represented By: Brian Erik Haan
Represented By: Dragan Gjorgiev
Represented By: Richard Burns Megley, Jr.
Represented By: David Jeffery Sheikh
Represented By: Ashley E LaValley
Represented By: Christopher J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?