McGhee v. Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Derek L McGhee
Defendant: Does 1 to 100, inclusive, Andeavor Logistics LP, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC and Andeavor
Case Number: 4:2018cv05999
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #16 Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference.Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 21, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference, filed by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics LP, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC.. (Lopez, Zaher) (Filed on 11/21/2018) Modified on 11/23/2018 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2018 Filing 15 Joint Stipulation Further Extending Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics LP, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, Derek L. McGhee. (Lopez, Zaher) (Filed on 10/29/2018) Modified on 10/30/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/16/18. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/28/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 11, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC.. (Lopez, Zaher) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics LP, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC and Derek L. McGhee. (Lopez, Zaher) (Filed on 10/4/2018) Modified on 10/4/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC (Rusche, Timothy) (Filed on 10/2/2018) Modified on 10/3/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 12 /26/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/2/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/15/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics LP, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #5 Declaration in Support, #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Declaration in Support, (Rusche, Timothy) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 Declaration of Karen Kawano in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byAndeavor, Andeavor Logistics LP, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Exhibit E-H, #3 Exhibit I-U)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Rusche, Timothy) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 Declaration of Timothy M. Rusche in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byAndeavor, Andeavor Logistics LP, Does 1 to 100, inclusive, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Rusche, Timothy) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics LP, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Western Refining Southwest, Inc for Andeavor Logistics LP, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Rusche, Timothy) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics LP, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC (Rusche, Timothy) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from C18-01699. Their case number is C18-01699. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12723210). Filed byAndeavor Logistics LP, Andeavor, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rusche, Timothy) (Filed on 9/28/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGhee v. Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek L McGhee
Represented By: Vincent Charles Granberry
Represented By: Joseph Lavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100, inclusive
Represented By: Timothy Michael Rusche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andeavor Logistics LP
Represented By: Timothy Michael Rusche
Represented By: Zaher Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC
Represented By: Timothy Michael Rusche
Represented By: Zaher Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andeavor
Represented By: Timothy Michael Rusche
Represented By: Zaher Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?