Doe v. Mitchell, et al.

Plaintiff: J. Doe
Defendant: Earline Mitchell and Kimberly Mitchell
Case Number: 4:2018cv06261
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Earline Mitchell, Kimberly Mitchell of Standing Order for Civil Cases Before District Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. (Montano, Michael) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:18-cv-06261-HSG . Re: #15 Certificate of Service filed by Earline Mitchell, Kimberly Mitchell. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Earline Mitchell, Kimberly Mitchell of Standing Order for Civil Cases Before District Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. (Montano, Michael) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/14/18. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by J. Doe.. (Sorensen, Rodney) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/13/2018. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Earline Mitchell of Additional Documents Required to Be Served, Including Judge Beeler's Standing Order, Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines, ECF Registration Handout, etc. (Montano, Michael) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Earline Mitchell re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Montano, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 Refund Status re #7 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 Application for Refund, by Earline Mitchell, Kimberly Mitchell. (Murphy, Anne Marie) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 Refund Status re #4 Application for Refund DECLINED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Earline Mitchell, Kimberly Mitchell.. (Montano, Michael) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 26CR3IPQ by Earline Mitchell, Kimberly Mitchell. (Montano, Michael) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 18-CIV-04906. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12758101). Filed by Kimberly Mitchell, Earline Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15, #3 Declaration of Earline Mitchell in Support of Defendant Earline Mitchell's Notice of Removal of Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1441(b) (Diversity), #4 Exhibit A)(Montano, Michael) (Filed on 10/12/2018) Modified on 10/15/2018 (fabS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Mitchell, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Doe
Represented By: Rodney B. Sorensen, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earline Mitchell
Represented By: Michael A. Montano
Represented By: Anne Marie Murphy
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Mitchell
Represented By: Michael A. Montano
Represented By: Anne Marie Murphy
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?