Federal Trade Commission v Forms Direct, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Forms Direct, Inc. and Cesare Alessandrini
Case Number: 4:2018cv06294
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15:0045
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #3 Stipulation FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND MONETARY JUDGMENT. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 14 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint, filed byFederal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Attachment B to Complaint)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Hsue, Patricia) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Trade Commission of Judge White's Standing Civil Orders (Hsue, Patricia) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 0/24/18. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/23/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Trade Commission of Judge Gilliam's Civil Standing Order (Hsue, Patricia) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for January 15, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by January 8, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:18-cv-06294-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/16/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Federal Trade Commission. (Hsue, Patricia) (Filed on 10/15/2018) Modified on 10/15/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND MONETARY JUDGMENT filed by Federal Trade Commission Forms Direct, Inc. (Hsue, Patricia) (Filed on 10/15/2018) Modified on 10/16/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/29/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Federal Trade Commission (no process). (Fee Waived) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hsue, Patricia) (Filed on 10/15/2018) Modified on 10/15/2018 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/15/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v Forms Direct, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forms Direct, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesare Alessandrini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Patricia Hsue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?