United States of America v. Nasey et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Department of Justice, Tax Division and United States of America
Defendant: San Francisco Tax Collector, Laurence F. Nasey, Evergreen Advantage, LLC, California Department of Fee & Tax Administration, Automotive Clinic, Inc., California Franchise Tax Board, California Board of Equalization, 624 Stanyan Street, LLC, Post Green Fell, LLC, 2360 Investors, LLC, California Employment Department, California State Board of Equalization and Automotive Clinic, Inc. doing business as Ted & Al's Towing
Case Number: 4:2018cv06467
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 19 DISCLAIMER OF DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TAX AND FEE ADMINISTRATION by California Department of Fee & Tax Administration. (Geary, Victoria) (Filed on 12/20/2018) Modified on 12/20/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2018 Filing 18 Disclaimer of Defendant California Employment Development Department to Complaint of United States by California Employment Department. (Stricklin, Marguerite) (Filed on 12/5/2018) Modified on 12/5/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #5 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/3/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #6 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/3/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 15 Proposed Order re #5 Stipulation by Evergreen Advantage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Stephenson, Alexa) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 14 Proposed Order re #6 Stipulation by Evergreen Advantage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Stephenson, Alexa) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. 2360 Investors, LLC served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Weidler, Mahana) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 12 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/30/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 [Proposed] Judgment re #1 Complaint by United States of America. (Weidler, Mahana) (Filed on 10/29/2018) Modified on 10/30/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER STAYING Order of Foreclosure and Judicial Sale. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/29/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order of Foreclosure and Judicial Sale. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/29/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to 2360 Investors, LLC, 624 Stanyan Street, LLC, Automotive Clinic, Inc., California Department of Fee & Tax Administration, California Employment Department, California Franchise Tax Board, California State Board of Equalization, Evergreen Advantage, LLC, Laurence F. Nasey, Post Green Fell, LLC, San Francisco Tax Collector. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #4 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by United States of America, Evergreen Advantage, LLC, 624 Stanyan Street, LLC. (Weidler, Mahana) (Filed on 10/25/2018) Modified on 10/26/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #4 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by United States of America, Post Green Fee, LLC, Evergreen Advantage, LLC. (Weidler, Mahana) (Filed on 10/25/2018) Modified on 10/26/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Entry of Judgment re #1 Complaint filed by United States of America, 624 Stanyan Street, LLC, Automotive Clinic, Inc., Laurence F. Nasey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order of Foreclosure and Judicial Sale, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Staying Foreclosure)(Weidler, Mahana) (Filed on 10/25/2018) Modified on 10/26/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendants' Names & Addresses)(Weidler, Mahana) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 2360 Investors, LLC, 624 Stanyan Street, LLC, Automotive Clinic, Inc., California Board of Equalization, California Department of Fee & Tax Administration, California Employment Department, California Franchise Tax Board, Evergreen Advantage, LLC, Laurence F. Nasey, Post Green Fell, LLC, San Francisco Tax Collector. Filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weidler, Mahana) (Filed on 10/23/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Nasey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Tax Collector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurence F. Nasey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evergreen Advantage, LLC
Represented By: Alexa Paige Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Fee & Tax Administration
Represented By: Victoria Christine Geary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automotive Clinic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Franchise Tax Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Board of Equalization
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 624 Stanyan Street, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Post Green Fell, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2360 Investors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Employment Department
Represented By: Marguerite Celeste Stricklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Board of Equalization
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automotive Clinic, Inc. doing business as Ted & Al's Towing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Department of Justice, Tax Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mahana Karimi Weidler
Represented By: Colin Christopher Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?