Righetti v. The Humane Society of the United States
Plaintiff: Matthew Righetti
Defendant: The Humane Society of the United States
Case Number: 4:2018cv06562
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Humane Society of the United States. Filed byMatthew Righetti. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Matthew Righetti. Service waived by The Humane Society of the United States waiver sent on 11/29/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Matthew Righetti.. (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to The Humane Society of the United States. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/9/2018. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Matthew Righetti . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Humane Society of the United States ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12798139.). Filed byMatthew Righetti. (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 10/26/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righetti v. The Humane Society of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: Reuben D. Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Humane Society of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?