Brittani Friedman v. Popsugar, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brittani Friedman
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 and Popsugar Inc
Case Number: 4:2018cv06623
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for February 26, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by February 19, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:18-cv-06623-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/4/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RELATING CASE to 18-cv-3752-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/4/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 30 Certificate of Interested Entities by Brittani Friedman (Burroughs, Scott) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 29 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Popsugar Inc. (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 11/14/2018) Modified on 11/14/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2018 Filing 28 Local Rule 3-13 Notice of Pendency of Other Action by Popsugar Inc. (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 11/14/2018) Modified on 11/14/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2018 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from the Central District of California, 2:18-cv-5888-CAS-MAA. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 26 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-05888. Case file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 10/31/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2018 Filing 24 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER PURSUSANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404 AND 1406 #15 , AND DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS #16 . Court Orders PopSugars motion to change venue to the U.S.District Court for the Northern District of California is hereby GRANTED. PopSugars motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. Case electronically transferred to USDC Northern California on 10/29/18. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated. ); Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (lc)
October 15, 2018 Filing 23 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #16 filed by Defendant Popsugar, Inc.. (Hur, Benedict)
October 15, 2018 Filing 22 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1404 and 1406 #15 filed by Defendant Popsugar, Inc.. (Hur, Benedict)
October 8, 2018 Filing 21 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1404 and 1406 #15 filed by Plaintiff Brittani Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Alan Burroughs, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Burroughs, Scott)
October 8, 2018 Filing 20 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #16 filed by Plaintiff Brittani Friedman. (Burroughs, Scott)
August 27, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Popsugar, Inc., (Hur, Benedict)
August 27, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Popsugar, Inc. NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
August 24, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
August 23, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Popsugar, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Hur, Benedict)
August 23, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1404 and 1406 filed by Defendant Popsugar, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Hur, Benedict)
August 23, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bevan Augusta Dowd on behalf of Defendant Popsugar, Inc. (Attorney Bevan Augusta Dowd added to party Popsugar, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dowd, Bevan)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-05888 CAS(MAAx). (rn)
July 31, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Travis Scott Silva on behalf of Defendant Popsugar, Inc. (Attorney Travis Scott Silva added to party Popsugar, Inc.(pty:dft))(Silva, Travis)
July 31, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Popsugar, Inc. answer now due 8/23/2018, filed by Defendant Popsugar, Inc..(Hur, Benedict)
July 31, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Benedict Yung Hur on behalf of Defendant Popsugar, Inc. (Attorney Benedict Yung Hur added to party Popsugar, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hur, Benedict)
July 25, 2018 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brittani Friedman, upon Defendant Popsugar, Inc. served on 7/12/2018, answer due 8/2/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robbie Smith, Person Authorized to Receive in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 6, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Popsugar, Inc. (esa)
July 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa)
July 5, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Brittani Friedman. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 5, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Brittani Friedman. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 5, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brittani Friedman. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brittani Friedman, (Burroughs, Scott)
July 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22043833 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Brittani Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A, #2 Exhibit 1-B) (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Brittani Friedman(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brittani Friedman v. Popsugar, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Popsugar Inc
Represented By: Benedict Yung Hur
Represented By: Bevan Augusta Dowd
Represented By: Travis Scott Silva
Represented By: Benedict Y. Hur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittani Friedman
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Represented By: Scott Alan Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?