Anderson v. Salesforce.com, Inc.

Plaintiff: Stephen Anderson
Defendant: Salesforce.com, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv06712
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ARBITRATE PLAINTIFF'S REMAINING CLAIM AND TO DISMISS CASE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #18 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2018)
December 31, 2018 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Arbitrate Plaintiff's Remaining Claim and to Dismiss Case filed by Salesforce.com, Inc. and Stephen Anderson. (Schwartz, Jason) (Filed on 12/31/2018) Modified on 1/2/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 17 ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 16 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY PENDING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #15 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 11, 2018 15 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Staying Discovery Pending Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Salesforce.com, Inc., Stephen Anderson. (Schwartz, Jason) (Filed on 12/11/2018) Modified on 12/11/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2018 14 Declaration of Jason Schwartz in Support of #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings Corrected Declaration to replace Dkt. 13-1 filed bySalesforce.com, Inc.. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Schwartz, Jason) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 12/19/2018. Replies due by 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Schwartz in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jason Schwartz, #3 Declaration of Kimberly Strashovskiy in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kimberly Strashovskiy, #5 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings)(Schwartz, Jason) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Zoe A. Klein. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 4, 2018 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Zoe A. Klein (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12898390) Filing fee previously paid on 12/4/2018 filed by Salesforce.com, Inc. (Klein, Zoe) (Filed on 12/4/2018) Modified on 12/5/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jason C. Schwartz. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 19, 2018 9 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Salesforce.com, Inc., Stephen Anderson. (Gorman, Joseph) (Filed on 11/19/2018) Modified on 11/20/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2018 8 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Salesforce.com, Inc. (Gorman, Joseph) (Filed on 11/19/2018) Modified on 11/20/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2018 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Jason C. Schwartz (Filing fee $310, receipt number 0971-12860568) filed by Salesforce.com, Inc. (Schwartz, Jason) (Filed on 11/19/2018) Modified on 11/20/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Abraham Gorman (Gorman, Joseph) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 13, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Anderson (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 6, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Salesforce.com, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/ 14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 5, 2018 2 Case assigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-12822408). Filed by Stephen Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 11/5/2018) Modified on 11/6/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Salesforce.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Anderson
Represented By: Nicole Brooke Gage
Represented By: Richard A. Hoyer
Represented By: Ryan L. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salesforce.com, Inc.
Represented By: Zoe Alexandra Klein
Represented By: Jason C Schwartz
Represented By: Joseph Abraham Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?