Smith v. Peterson

Plaintiff: Joeron Smith
Defendant: Terry Peterson
Case Number: 4:2018cv06817
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 Mail sent to Joeron Smith returned as undeliverable re #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint, #4 Clerk's Notice. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 Mail sent to Joeron Smith returned as undeliverable re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(kawlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding resources Available to Pro Se Litigants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2019 01:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joeron Smith. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Terry Peterson (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Joeron Smith. Consent/Declination due by 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joeron Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?