City of Berkeley Rent Stabilization Board v. Fox et al
Plaintiff: City of Berkeley Rent Stabilization Board
Defendant: Richard Fox and Ann Fox
Case Number: 4:2018cv07371
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 Acknowledgment of receipt of remand documents from Alameda County Superior Court. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Remanding Case to Alameda County Superior Court. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Remand. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/2/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/10/18. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 7, 2018 Sent by U.S. MAIL a copy of #3 Report & Recommendation to Remand Order to Richard Fox & Ann Fox at their Berkeley, California Address. Re #3 Order & Per Chambers (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Remand by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Objections due by 12/21/2018. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2019 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 EDL - Standing Order)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL: No Process, from Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is RG18910932. (Filing fee $400. Receipt No. 44611015932). Filed by Ann Fox, Richard Fox. Consent/Declination due by 12/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Berkeley Rent Stabilization Board v. Fox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Berkeley Rent Stabilization Board
Represented By: Matthew Brown
Represented By: Brendan O Darrow, Darro
Represented By: Matthew Jay Siegel
Represented By: Matthew Jay Siegel,
Represented By: Brendan O. Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?