Jarose v. County of Humboldt

Plaintiff: Pamela Jarose
Defendant: County of Humboldt
Case Number: 4:2018cv07383
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9601
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Counterclaim byPamela Jarose. (Greben, Jan) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 COUNTERCLAIM against Pamela Jarose. Filed byCounty of Humboldt. (Rocha, Michael) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 COUNTY OF HUMBOLDT ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCounty of Humboldt. (Rocha, Michael) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pamela Jarose of Case Management Scheduling Order for Reassigned Civil Case (Greben, Jan) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2019. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2019 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 12/19/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/19/18. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pamela Jarose.. (Greben, Jan) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Marie Monroe (Monroe, Christine) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to County of Humboldt. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2019 02:00 PM in McKinleyville. Parties may participate in the Initial Case Management Conference by telephone and should contact Judge Illman's courtroom deputy for instructions. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pamela Jarose identifying Other Affiliate Jennifer Jensen, Other Affiliate Pamela Jarose, Other Affiliate John R Braun, Other Affiliate Marcia Braun, Other Affiliate Jarred Ryan Braun, Other Affiliate Robert McKenzie, Other Affiliate Kathleen Braun, Other Affiliate Pauline Braun for Pamela Jarose. (Greben, Jan) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/21/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Greben, Jan) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Pamela Jarose, Executor of the Estate of John R. Braun against County of Humboldt. Filed by Pamela Jarose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)*** ( Filing fee of $400 paid, Receipt # 0971-12909511)***(Greben, Jan) (Filed on 12/7/2018) Modified on 12/7/2018 (bwS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarose v. County of Humboldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Humboldt
Represented By: Michael Cruz Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Jarose
Represented By: Jan Adam Greben
Represented By: Christine Marie Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?