Cisco Systems, Inc. et al v. Sheikh et al
Plaintiff: Cisco Systems, Inc. and Cisco Technology, Inc.
Defendant: IT Devices Online, Inc., Purefuturetech, LLC, Jessica Little, Kamran Sheikh, Advanced Digital Solutions International, Inc., Zahid Hassan Sheikh, Roya Sheikh, Shahid H. Sheikh, Roya Sadaghiani, Donny Sheikh, Jessica McIntosh and Jessica Little also known as Jessica McIntosh doing business as McIntosh Networks
Case Number: 4:2018cv07602
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by IT Devices Online, Inc., Zahid Hassan Sheikh (Stuckey, John) (Filed on 1/31/2019) Modified on 2/1/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Roya Sheikh, Purefuturetech, LLC, Jessica Little, Kamran Sheikh, Advanced Digital Solutions International, Inc., Shahid H. Sheikh. Service waived by Jessica Little waiver sent on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (McManis, James) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #18 Stipulation. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order The court's record shows a different address from what is appearing on the document. Please update your personal profile on ECF. Re: #11 Notice of Appearance ( Michael C. Robinson )filed by IT Devices Online, Inc., #10 Notice of Appearance (John Bradley Stuckey ) filed by IT Devices Online, Inc. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Advanced Digital Solutions International, Inc., Jessica Little, Purefuturetech, LLC, Kamran Sheikh, Roya Sheikh, Shahid H. Sheikh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. (McManis, James) (Filed on 1/25/2019) Modified on 1/28/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cisco Technology, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. Purefuturetech, LLC served on 1/5/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Nelson, Richard) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cisco Technology, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. Advanced Digital Solutions International, Inc. served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (Nelson, Richard) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cisco Technology, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. IT Devices Online, Inc. served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (Nelson, Richard) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cisco Technology, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. Kamran Sheikh served on 1/5/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Nelson, Richard) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cisco Technology, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. Roya Sheikh served on 1/5/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Nelson, Richard) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cisco Technology, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. Shahid H. Sheikh served on 1/5/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Nelson, Richard) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John Bradley Stuckey Michael C. Robinson (Stuckey, John) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John Bradley Stuckey (Stuckey, John) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 IT DEVICES ONLINE, INC. AND ZAHID DONNY HASSAN SHEIKHS ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byIT Devices Online, Inc., Zahid Hassan Sheikh. (Stuckey, John) (Filed on 1/25/2019) Modified on 1/28/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding trademark (cc: to register). (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Advanced Digital Solutions International, Inc., IT Devices Online, Inc., Jessica Little, Purefuturetech, LLC, Kamran Sheikh, Roya Sheikh, Shahid H. Sheikh, Zahid Hassan Sheikh. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc. (Boyd, Ian) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc. (Chang, Anna) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Nelson, Richard) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Proposed Summons. The summons should NOT be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The correct event can be found at Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Proposed Summons. Please re-file in its entirety. Re:[1-1] Summons In a Civil Action, filed by Cisco Technology, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL with jury demand against All Defendants. ($400. Receipt No. 0971-12939029) Filed by Cisco Technology, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons In a Civil Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Richard) (Filed on 12/18/2018) Modified on 12/19/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cisco Systems, Inc. et al v. Sheikh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Joseph Nelson
Represented By: Anna P Chang
Represented By: Ian K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cisco Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Joseph Nelson
Represented By: Anna P Chang
Represented By: Ian K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IT Devices Online, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Charles Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: John Bradley Stuckey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purefuturetech, LLC
Represented By: James McManis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Little
Represented By: James McManis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamran Sheikh
Represented By: James McManis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Digital Solutions International, Inc.
Represented By: James McManis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zahid Hassan Sheikh
Represented By: Michael Charles Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: John Bradley Stuckey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roya Sheikh
Represented By: James McManis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shahid H. Sheikh
Represented By: James McManis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roya Sadaghiani
Represented By: James McManis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Sheikh
Represented By: Michael Charles Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: John Bradley Stuckey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica McIntosh
Represented By: James McManis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Little also known as Jessica McIntosh doing business as McIntosh Networks
Represented By: James McManis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?