Kenneth v. Yeung Chi Shing Holding (Delaware) Inc. et al

Plaintiff: YEUNG BING KWONG KENNETH and Yeung Bing Kwong Kennth
Defendant: MT. OSCAR LIMITED, a Hong Kong entity, CHEUNG KIT MAN MELINA, YEUNG LUK PUI LAN AGNES, FUNG CHUNG YEE CAROLINE, YEUNG PING LEUNG HOWARD, DOES 1 through 100, inclusive, YEUNG CHI SHING HOLDING (DELAWARE) INC., a Delaware Corporation, Yeung Chi Shing Holding (Delaware) Inc., MT. Oscar Limited and Yeung Ping Leung Caroline
Case Number: 4:2018cv07644
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 4/1/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/3/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Yeung Bing Kwong Kennth.. (Collins, Corey) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Defendants Yeung Luk Pui Lan Agnes, Yeung Ping Leung Caroline, Yeung Ping Leung Howard, MT. Oscar Limited, Cheung Kit Man Melina & Yeung Chi Shing Holding (Delaware) Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/2/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Frazier, Mark) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Derivative Claims: (1) 18 U.S.C. Section 1962(c) (CIVIL RICO); (2) 18 U.S.C. Section 1962(d) (CIVIL RICO CONSPIRACY); (3) Breach of the Duty of Loyalty; (4) Breach of the Duty of Good Faith; (5) Breach of the Duty of Care; (6) Declaratory Judgment-The "Advisor Fees" Were Illegally Paid in Violation of Federal and State Law; INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS: (7) 8 Del. Code Section 225 (Attempted Wrongful Removal as Director); (8) Declaratory Judgment-Kenneth is not Liable for Director Defendants' Actions; Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12943149). Filed by Yeung Bing Kwong Kenneth. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, #(2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, #(3) Exhibit Exhibit 3, #(4) Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Frazier, Mark) (Filed on 12/19/2018) Modified on 12/21/2018 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenneth v. Yeung Chi Shing Holding (Delaware) Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MT. OSCAR LIMITED, a Hong Kong entity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEUNG KIT MAN MELINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YEUNG LUK PUI LAN AGNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUNG CHUNG YEE CAROLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YEUNG PING LEUNG HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YEUNG CHI SHING HOLDING (DELAWARE) INC., a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yeung Chi Shing Holding (Delaware) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MT. Oscar Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yeung Ping Leung Caroline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YEUNG BING KWONG KENNETH
Represented By: Mark Bingham Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yeung Bing Kwong Kennth
Represented By: Mark Bingham Frazier
Represented By: Corey Hayden Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?