Freeman v. Rohnert Park Department of Public Safety et al
Plaintiff: Huedell Freeman
Defendant: Brian Masterson, Jacy Tatum, City of Rohnert Park, Joseph Huffaker, City of Rohnert Park Public Safety Department, David Sutter, Rohnert Park Department of Public Safety and Brandon "Jacy" Tatum
Case Number: 4:2018cv07661
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RE Docket No. 28 in case no. 18-cv-6964-HSG. The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and noreassignments shall occur. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that the Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 3/20/2019 01:30 PM has been rescheduled to 4/3/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. The Joint Case Management Statement is due no later than 3/27/2019. Plaintiff shall serve the Defendants with a copy of this Clerk's Notice and file a proof of service with the court. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to City of Rohnert Park, Joseph Huffaker, Brian Masterson, Rohnert Park Department of Public Safety, David Sutter, Brandon "Jacy" Tatum. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2018)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attachment to Proposed Summons)(Gallenson, Stephen) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Huedell Freeman.. (Gaskell, Jane) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
December 21, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Summons will be Issued by the Names as they Appear on the Complaint. [err201] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety Re: #3 Proposed Summons filed by Huedell Freeman. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Gaskell, Jane) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Huedell Freeman (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-12946432). Filed by Huedell Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Gaskell, Jane) (Filed on 12/20/2018) Modified on 12/21/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Rohnert Park Department of Public Safety et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Masterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacy Tatum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rohnert Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Huffaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rohnert Park Public Safety Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohnert Park Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon "Jacy" Tatum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huedell Freeman
Represented By: Jane Gaskell
Represented By: Stephen M. Gallenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?