Okowa v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bobby S. Okowa
Defendant: Akeem Bailey and United Parcel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00214
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Bobby S. Okowa, ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/8/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 14 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice by Bobby S. Okowa, United Parcel Service Inc (Casey, Edward) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/10/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 2/19/2019. Replies due by 2/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Koltun, Gregory) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 4/22/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities; Demand for Jury Trial by Bobby S. Okowa (Casey, Edward) (Filed on 1/25/2019) Modified on 1/28/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United Parcel Service, Inc... (Bausback, Ian) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. and Bobby S. Okowa. (Koltun, Gregory) (Filed on 1/17/2019) Modified on 1/18/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Parcel Service, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Koltun, Gregory) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by United Parcel Service, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate United Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate United Parcel Service, Inc. (Ohio), Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Co. (Delaware Corporation) for United Parcel Service, Inc.. re Electronic Filing Error, (Koltun, Gregory) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 14, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Names of interested entities or person MUST be entered at the prompt. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its ent irety. Re: #3 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by United Parcel Service, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Koltun, Gregory) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/25/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is RG18931721. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12997573). Filed byUnited Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Koltun, Gregory) (Filed on 1/11/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Okowa v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby S. Okowa
Represented By: Edward Charles Casey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akeem Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Bryant Koltun
Represented By: Ian Kiely Bausback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?