PG&E Corporation et al v. Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Plaintiff: Pacific Gas and Electric Company and PG&E Corporation
Defendant: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Petitioner: NextEra Energy Partners, L.P., NextEra Energy, Inc., NRG Energy, Inc., Calpine Corporation, Topaz Solar Farms, LLC, Middle River Power, LLC, EDF Renewables, Inc., Exelon Corporation, Diablo Winds, LLC, Clearway Energy Group, LLC, First Solar, Inc., Marubeni Corporation, Willow Springs Solar 3, LLC, TerraForm Power, Inc., MRP San Joaquin Energy, LLC, Crockett Cogeneration, AV Solar Ranch I, LLC, Consolidated Edison Development, Inc., Clearway Energy, Inc., Southern Power Company and Mojave Solar, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00599
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE REFERENCE. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/11/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by First Solar, Inc., Mojave Solar, LLC, Willow Springs Solar 3, LLC re #21 Joinder (Park, Amy) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 25 RECOMMENDATION RE #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference. Signed by Dennis Montali, United States Bankruptcy Judge, on 2/28/2019. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 23 Request for Judicial Notice re #22 Joint Reply in Support of Motion to Withdraw the Reference filed by Calpine Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Related document(s) #22 ) (McKane, Mark) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Filing 22 JOINT Reply in Support of Motions to Withdraw Reference filed by Calpine Corporation, NextEra Energy Partners, L.P., Consolidated Edison Development, Inc., Diablo Winds, LLC, Exelon Corporation, AV Solar Ranch I, LLC, Topaz Solar Farms, LLC, Southern Power Company, EDF Renewables, Inc., Clearway Energy, Inc., Clearway Energy Group, LLC, NRG Energy, Inc., TerraForm Power, Inc., Crockett Cogeneration, Middle River Power, LLC, MRP San Joaqin Energy, LLC, Mojave Solar, LLC, and NextEra Energy, Inc. (Related document(s) #14 ) (McKane, Mark) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Filing 21 Joinder of Additional PPA Counterparties re #1 Withdrawal of Reference, by First Solar, Inc., Willow Springs Solar 3, LLC, Mojave Solar, LLC. (Park, Amy) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David R. Seligman. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that a hearing on the #1 bankruptcy withdrawal motion has been set for May 16, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of David R. Seligman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13106768.) filed by Calpine Corporation. (Seligman, David) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by NextEra Energy Partners, L.P., NextEra Energy, Inc. (Kidder, Samuel) (Filed on 2/20/2019) Modified on 2/21/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan D. Forstot. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Vice for Hugh M. McDonald. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #6 Joinder, #1 Withdrawal of Reference by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Benvenutti, Peter) (Filed on 2/19/2019) Modified on 2/20/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan D. Forstot ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13102997.) filed by Consolidated Edison Development, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Forstot, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Admission of Attorney Howard Seife. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Hugh M. McDonald ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13102840.) filed by Consolidated Edison Development, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(McDonald, Hugh) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Bankruptcy Court Order Authorizing Calpine Corporation, et al., to Intervene in Adversary Proceeding by Calpine Corporation. (McKane, Mark) (Filed on 2/19/2019) Modified on 2/20/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Bankruptcy Court Order Authorizing Consolidated Edison Development, Inc. to Intervene in Adversary Proceeding by Consolidated Edison Development, Inc. (Ozel, Gabriel) (Filed on 2/15/2019) Modified on 2/19/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Howard Seife to Practice Pro Hac Vice (Civil Local Rule 11-3) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13097836.) filed by NextEra Energy Partners, L.P., NextEra Energy, Inc.. (Seife, Howard) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Bankruptcy Court Order Authorizing NextEra Energy to Intervene in Adversary Proceeding by NextEra Energy Partners, L.P., NextEra Energy, Inc. re #1 Withdrawal of Reference, (Kidder, Samuel) (Filed on 2/15/2019) Modified on 2/19/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 Joinder re #1 Withdrawal of Reference, by AV Solar Ranch I, LLC, Calpine Corporation, Clearway Energy Group, LLC, Clearway Energy, Inc., Crockett Cogeneration, Diablo Winds, LLC, EDF Renewables, Inc., MRP San Joaquin Energy, LLC, Marubeni Corporation, Middle River Power, LLC, NRG Energy, Inc., Southern Power Company, TerraForm Power, Inc., Topaz Solar Farms, LLC. and Exelon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Notice of Transmission of Motion, #3 USBC Docket Sheet)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019) Modified on 2/7/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by NextEra Energy Partners, L.P., NextEra Energy, Inc. re #1 Withdrawal of Reference,, Notice of NextEra Energy's Motion to Withdraw Reference of Adversary Proceeding (Kidder, Samuel) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/5/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The Clerk of the Court shall reassign this action to another District Judge. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/4/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE to counsel re Notice of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 Withdrawal of Bankruptcy Reference Upon Order of the Court Bankruptcy Court case number 1930088, Adv. Proc. 19-03003. Filed byNextEra Energy Partners, L.P., NextEra Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket Sheet, #2 Motiont to Withdraw, #3 Motion Withdrawal of Reference- Part 1, #4 Motion Withdrawal of Reference- Part 2, #5 Declaration Part 1, #6 Declaration Part 2, #7 Declaration Part 3, #8 Declaration Part 4, #9 Declaration Part 5, #10 Declaration Part 6, #11 Declaration Part 7)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2019) Modified on 3/1/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PG&E Corporation et al v. Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NextEra Energy Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Kenneth Nathan Klee
Represented By: Samuel Morgan Kidder
Represented By: David Marc Stern
Represented By: Howard Seife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NextEra Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Nathan Klee
Represented By: Samuel Morgan Kidder
Represented By: David Marc Stern
Represented By: Howard Seife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NRG Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Navtej Singh Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Calpine Corporation
Represented By: David Richard Seligman
Represented By: Mark Edward McKane
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Topaz Solar Farms, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Middle River Power, LLC
Represented By: Amy Christine Quartarolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EDF Renewables, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Exelon Corporation
Represented By: Richard W. Esterkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Diablo Winds, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clearway Energy Group, LLC
Represented By: Navtej Singh Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: First Solar, Inc.
Represented By: Amy S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marubeni Corporation
Represented By: Navtej Singh Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willow Springs Solar 3, LLC
Represented By: Amy S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TerraForm Power, Inc.
Represented By: Navtej Singh Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MRP San Joaquin Energy, LLC
Represented By: Amy Christine Quartarolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Crockett Cogeneration
Represented By: Amy Christine Quartarolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AV Solar Ranch I, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Esterkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Consolidated Edison Development, Inc.
Represented By: Gabriel Ozel
Represented By: Jonathan D Forstot
Represented By: Hugh M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clearway Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Navtej Singh Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Southern Power Company
Represented By: Gabriel Ozel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mojave Solar, LLC
Represented By: Amy S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Represented By: Peter J. Benvenutti
Represented By: Jane Kim
Represented By: Tobias S. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PG&E Corporation
Represented By: Peter J. Benvenutti
Represented By: Jane Kim
Represented By: Tobias S. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Represented By: Danielle Ann Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?