Flockton et al v. AMCO Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Berkeley Flockton and Nancy McFarland
Defendant: AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa Corporation and AMCO Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00708
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
0 Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
1 Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for May 14, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by May 7, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-00708-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/21/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by AMCO Insurance Company.. (Martin, Sonia) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AMCO Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Notice (Other), 2 Case Assigned by Intake, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Williams, Erica) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/14/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Plaintiff that Action Has Been Removed to Federal Court by AMCO Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal (Williams, Erica) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/14/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2019 Answer to Removed Complaint (See Doc No. #1 ) byAMCO Insurance Company. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMCO Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allied Group Inc., Other Affiliate Allied Holdings (Delaware) Inc. for AMCO Insurance Company. (Martin, Sonia) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/14/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/22/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their case number is SCV263275. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-13077479). Filed by AMCO Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Martin, Sonia) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/14/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flockton et al v. AMCO Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkeley Flockton
Represented By: Ivo Labar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy McFarland
Represented By: Ivo Labar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa Corporation
Represented By: Sonia Renee Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCO Insurance Company
Represented By: Erica Lynn Williams
Represented By: Sonia Renee Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?