Vargas-Ortiz v. Nielsen et al

Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Erik Bonnar and Matthew G. Whitaker
Petitioner: Everardo Vargas-Ortiz
Case Number: 4:2019cv00709
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by Erik Bonnar, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Matthew G. Whitaker, and Everado Vargas-Ortiz. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Everardo Vargas-Ortiz (Pennington, Alison) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Erik Bonnar, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Matthew G. Whitaker. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Everardo Vargas-Ortiz.. (Pennington, Alison) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/22/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Pennington, Alison) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 0971-13077665.). Filed byEverardo Vargas-Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pennington, Alison) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 **RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. 2** PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 0971-13077624.). Filed byEverardo Vargas-Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Exhibits)(Pennington, Alison) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas-Ortiz v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Everardo Vargas-Ortiz
Represented By: Alison Edith Pennington
Represented By: Lisa V Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Bonnar
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G. Whitaker
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?