Ingham v. Environment Celebration Institute et al

Plaintiff: Elaine Ingham
Defendant: James Eddington, Carole Ann Rollins and Environment Celebration Institute
Case Number: 4:2019cv00725
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 24 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Green, Phil) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff Elaine Ingham (Nardell, J.) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #21 STIPULATED MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE . Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2019) Modified on 4/3/2019 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Relief from Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference-Corrected filed by James Eddington, Environment Celebration Institute, Carole Ann Rollins, and Elaine Ingham. (Green, Phil) (Filed on 4/1/2019) Modified on 4/2/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2019 Filing 20 Counter-Defendant Elaine Ingham's AMENDED ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant's Environment Celebration Institute, Carol Ann Rollins, and James Eddington by Elaine Ingham. (Nardell, J.) (Filed on 4/1/2019) Modified on 4/2/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2019 Filing 19 Counter-Defendant Elaine Ingham's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant's Environment Celebration Institute, Carol Ann Rollins, and James Eddington byElaine Ingham. (Nardell, J.) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 18 **RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. #21 ** STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Relief from Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference filed by James Eddington, Environment Celebration Institute, Carole Ann Rollins, and Elaine Ingham. (Green, Phil) (Filed on 3/28/2019) Modified on 3/29/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/2/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Eddington, Environment Celebration Institute, Carole Ann Rollins.. (Green, Phil) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants/Counter-Claimants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/26/2019. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 15 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byJames Eddington, Environment Celebration Institute, Carole Ann Rollins. (Green, Phil) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 14 COUNTERCLAIM S OF ECI, Rollins, Eddington against Elaine Ingham. Filed byJames Eddington, Carole Ann Rollins, Environment Celebration Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Green, Phil) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byJames Eddington, Environment Celebration Institute, Carole Ann Rollins. (Green, Phil) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elaine Ingham.. (Nardell, J.) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/13/2019. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine Ingham. Carole Ann Rollins served on 2/18/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (CORRECTED) (Nardell, J.) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine Ingham. James Eddington served on 2/18/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Nardell, J.) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine Ingham. Environment Celebration Institute served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. (CORRECTED) (Nardell, J.) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 ***INCOMPLETE PDF. SEE DOCKET #8 FOR CORRECT PDF.***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine Ingham. Environment Celebration Institute served on 2/18/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Nardell, J.) (Filed on 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/26/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine Ingham. Carole Ann Rollins served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Nardell, J.) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to James Eddington, Environment Celebration Institute, Carole Ann Rollins. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/25/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Nardell, J.) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against James Eddington, Environment Celebration Institute, Carole Ann Rollins with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13079245.). Filed by Elaine Ingham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nardell, J.) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingham v. Environment Celebration Institute et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Eddington
Represented By: Phil Green
Represented By: Beverly R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carole Ann Rollins
Represented By: Phil Green
Represented By: Beverly R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environment Celebration Institute
Represented By: Phil Green
Represented By: Beverly R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Ingham
Represented By: J. Timothy Nardell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?