PG&E Corporation et al v. Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Plaintiff: PG&E Corporation and Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Defendant: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Petitioner: United States of America
Intervenor Defendant: MC Shiloh IV Holdings, LLC, Southern Power Company, NextEra Energy, Inc., Topaz Solar Farms LLC, Exelon Corporation, Willow Springs Solar 3, LLC, MRP San Joaquin Energy, LLC, Diablo Winds, LLC, NRG Energy, Inc., Capital Dynamics, Inc., TerraForm Power, Inc., Clearway Energy, Inc., AV Solar Ranch 1, LLC, FTP Power LLC, Clearway Energy Group LLC, First Solar, Inc., Crocket Cogeneration, Mojave Solar LLC, Consolidated Edison Development, Inc., Calpine Corporation, Enel Green Power North America, Inc. and Middle River Power, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00781
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE REFERENCE. ***Civil Case Terminated.***Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/11/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY (re #5 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Its Motion to Withdraw the Reference ) filed byFederal Energy Regulatory Commission. (Huang, Shane) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY in Support of #1 Withdrawal of Reference, #8 Response ( Non Motion ), filed by Federal Energy Regulatory Commission. (Related document(s) #1 , #8 ) (Huang, Shane) (Filed on 3/1/2019) Modified on 3/4/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Huang (Huang, Shane) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 RECOMMENDATION RE #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference. Signed by Dennis Montali, United States Bankruptcy Judge, on 2/28/2019. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to #1 Withdrawal of Reference by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Benvenutti, Peter) (Filed on 2/27/2019) Modified on 2/28/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #5 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Its Motion to Withdraw the Reference ) filed byPG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Benvenutti, Peter) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Joinder re #5 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Its Motion to Withdraw the Reference Joinder of Intervenor-Defendant PPA Counterparties in FERC's Motion to Expedite Consideration of its Motion to Withdraw the Reference by NextEra Energy, Inc.. (Stern, David) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Its Motion to Withdraw the Reference filed by Federal Energy Regulatory Commission. (Attachments: #1 Pham Declaration)(Pham, Danielle) (Filed on 2/20/2019) Modified on 2/21/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that a hearing on the #1 bankruptcy withdrawal motion has been set for May 16, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of FERC's Motion to Withdraw Reference by Federal Energy Regulatory Commission re #1 Withdrawal of Reference, (Pham, Danielle) (Filed on 2/19/2019) Modified on 2/20/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE to counsel re Notice of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 Withdrawal of Bankruptcy Reference Upon Order of the Court. Bankruptcy Court case number USBC 19-30088, AD 19-03003. Filed byUnited States. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 USBC Court Docket Sheet)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/13/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/1/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PG&E Corporation et al v. Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: MC Shiloh IV Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Southern Power Company
Represented By: Gabriel Ozel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: NextEra Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Nathan Klee
Represented By: David Marc Stern
Represented By: Samuel Morgan Kidder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Topaz Solar Farms LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Krause,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Exelon Corporation
Represented By: Richard W. Esterkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Willow Springs Solar 3, LLC
Represented By: Amy S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: MRP San Joaquin Energy, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Richard Harris
Represented By: Amy Christine Quartarolo
Represented By: Andrew Matthew Parlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Diablo Winds, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: NRG Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Capital Dynamics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: TerraForm Power, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Clearway Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: AV Solar Ranch 1, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Esterkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: FTP Power LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Clearway Energy Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: First Solar, Inc.
Represented By: Amy S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Crocket Cogeneration
Represented By: Christopher Richard Harris
Represented By: Amy Christine Quartarolo
Represented By: Andrew Matthew Parlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Mojave Solar LLC
Represented By: Amy S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Consolidated Edison Development, Inc.
Represented By: Gabriel Ozel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Calpine Corporation
Represented By: Mark Edward McKane
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Enel Green Power North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Middle River Power, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Richard Harris
Represented By: Amy Christine Quartarolo
Represented By: Andrew Matthew Parlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Danielle Ann Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PG&E Corporation
Represented By: Peter J. Benvenutti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Represented By: Peter J. Benvenutti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Represented By: Danielle Ann Pham
Represented By: Shane Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?