State of California et al v. Trump et al Featured Case

Sixteen states including California have filed a lawsuit against President Trump over his declaration of an emergency in order to build a wall along the southern border of the United States. The plaintiff states allege that the president lacks power under the Constitution to allocate funds for constructing a wall along the border because Congress retains the spending power.

Plaintiff: State of Minnesota, State of Maryland, State of Connecticut, State of New Mexico, Attorney General Dana Nessel, State of Nevada, State of Oregon, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Colorado, State of Illinois, State of Hawaii, State of Delaware, State of Maine, State of New York, State of New Jersey, State of California, State of Vermont, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Wisconsin and State of Rhode Island
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Steven T. Mnuchin, United States of America, U.S. Department of Defense, Mark T. Esper, Richard V. Spencer, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Heather Wilson, David Bernhardt, U.S. Department of the Interior, Patrick M. Shanahan, U.S. Department of the Treasury, Donald J. Trump and Department of Defense
Petitioner: Southern Border Communities Coalition and Sierra Club
Case Number: 4:2019cv00872
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 210 NOTICE by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ryan D. McCarthy, Steven T. Mnuchin, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson re 204 Notice (Other),, Supplemental Notice Regarding Decision by the Department of Defense to Authorize Additional Border Barrier Projects Pursuant to 10 U.S.C. § 284 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 209 STATUS REPORT Filed Jointly By Plaintiffs and Defendants Proposing Briefing Schedule For Summary Judgment Motions on Claims Related to 10 U.S.C. § 2808 by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ryan D. McCarthy, Steven T. Mnuchin, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 205 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Nakatsuji, Robert. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 207 Supplement to 206 Notice of Decision by the Department of Defense to Authorize Border Barrier Projects Pursuant to 10 U.S.C. § 2808 by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ryan D. McCarthy, Steven T. Mnuchin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Patrick M. Shanahan, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 9/5/2019) Modified on 9/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2019 Filing 206 NOTICE of Decision by the Department of Defense to Authorize Border Barrier Projects Pursuant to 10 U.S.C. § 2808 by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ryan D. McCarthy, Steven T. Mnuchin, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 9/3/2019) Modified on 9/4/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2019 Filing 205 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13670617.) filed by State of Hawaii. (Nakatsuji, Robert) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 204 NOTICE Of Decision by the Department of Defense to Authorize Additional Border Barrier Projects Pursuant to 10 U.S.C. § 284 by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ryan D. McCarthy, Steven T. Mnuchin, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 8/27/2019) Modified on 8/28/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 202 Stipulation Dismissing without Prejudice TFF Claims. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 202 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing without Prejudice TFF Claims filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, Dana Nessel, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Wisconsin and Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Dismissing Without Prejudice TFF Claims)(Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 8/2/2019) Modified on 8/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER of United States Supreme Court. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 199 Stipulation Staying Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule on Claims Related to 10 U.S.C. § 2808. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 199 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule on Claims Related to 10 U.S.C. § 2808 filed by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ryan D. McCarthy, Steven T. Mnuchin, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson, State of California and other Plaintiff States. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 7/18/2019) Modified on 7/19/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2019 Filing 198 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 7/17/2019. Total Time in Court: 10 Minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Christine Chuang; Mollie Lee; Heather Leslie; Gavin McCabe; Craig Newby; Lee Sherman; Justin Sullivan; James Zahradka and Dror Ladin. Defendant Attorney: Andrew Warden. The Court advises the parties that it will grant the stipulation and proposed order in Sierra Club v. Trump, No. 4:19-cv-00892-HSG (docket no. 191). The parties in California v. Trump, No. 4:19-cv-00872-HSG are directed to meet and confer and e-file (1) a revised stipulation and proposed order regarding summary judgment briefing related to 10 U.S.C. § 2808, and (2) a stipulated dismissal without prejudice concerning claims related to the Treasury Forfeiture Fund. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/17/2019)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER of USCA, Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Appeals is Granted, as to (145 in 4:19-cv-00892-HSG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Steven Mnuchin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Patrick M. Shanahan, Donald J. Trump, (187 in 4:19-cv-00892-HSG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Steven Mnuchin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Patrick M. Shanahan, Donald J. Trump, (187 in 4:19-cv-00872-HSG) Notice of Appeal,, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, David Bernhardt, Richard V. Spencer, Mark T. Esper, Department of Defense, United States of America, Patrick M. Shanahan, U.S. Department of the Interior, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Steven T. Mnuchin, U.S. Department of the Treasury, Donald J. Trump, (191 in 4:19-cv-00872-HSG) Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by State of California, State of New Mexico (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct event is "Declaration." Event can be found under Civil Events > Motions and Related Filings > Moti ons-General > Declaration in Support/Opposition. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 196 Notice (Other) filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Ryan D. McCarthy, David Bernhardt, Richard V. Spencer, Mark T. Esper, Department of Defense, United States of America, U.S. Department of the Interior, Kevin K. McAleenan, Heather Wilson, Steven T. Mnuchin, U.S. Department of the Treasury, Donald J. Trump. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 196 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Loren Flossman Addressing Treasury Fofeiture Fund by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ryan D. McCarthy, Steven T. Mnuchin, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Flossman Declaration (July 11, 2019))(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 7/12/2019) Modified on 7/15/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2019 Filing 195 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kathleen R. Hartnett (Hartnett, Kathleen) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 9, 2019 Set Hearing, See Docket Nos. 194 in case no. 19-cv-00872-HSG and 193 in case no. 19-cv-00892-HSG: Telephone Conference set for 7/17/2019 03:00 PM in Oakland, Chambers before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., STAYING all outstanding summary judgment briefing deadlines and SETTING a telephone conference for July 17, 2019 at 3:00 p.m., to discuss a briefing schedule. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 193 USCA Case Number 19-16336 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for 191 Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by State of California, State of New Mexico. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 192 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule on Claims Related to 10 U.S.C. § 2808 and the Treasury Forfeiture Fund filed by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ryan D. McCarthy, Steven T. Mnuchin, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson, and Plaintiff States. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 7/8/2019) Modified on 7/9/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2019 Filing 191 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 186 Judgment, 185 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,, by State of California, State of New Mexico. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-13498158 paid.) Appeal Record due by 8/7/2019. (Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER of USCA: Defer resolution of the request to consolidate appeal No. 19-16299, which will be addressed by separate order as to 187 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, David Bernhardt, Richard V. Spencer, Mark T. Esper, Department of Defense, United States of America, Patrick M. Shanahan, U.S. Department of the Interior, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Steven T. Mnuchin, U.S. Department of the Treasury, Donald J. Trump (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 189 USCA Case Number 19-16299 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for 187 Notice of Appeal,, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, David Bernhardt, Richard V. Spencer, Mark T. Esper, Department of Defense, United States of America, Patrick M. Shanahan, U.S. Department of the Interior, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Steven T. Mnuchin, U.S. Department of the Treasury, Donald J. Trump. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 188 NOTICE of Filing of Administrative Record for the Treasury Forfeiture Fund by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ryan D. McCarthy, Steven T. Mnuchin, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification, # 2 Exhibit TFF Administrative Record)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 7/1/2019) Modified on 7/2/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2019 Filing 187 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Steven T. Mnuchin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Patrick M. Shanahan, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America. Appeal of Judgment 186 , Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,, 185 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 6/29/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 186 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/28/2019.(hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 176 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; DENYING 182 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; CERTIFYING Judgment for Appeal.(hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 184 JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Defendants' Construction Plans by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Steven T. Mnuchin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Patrick M. Shanahan, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson, State of California, et al. (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 6/28/2019) Modified on 6/30/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2019 Filing 183 REPLY (re 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byState of California, State of New Mexico. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 182 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Steven T. Mnuchin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Patrick M. Shanahan, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson. Responses due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 6/19/2019) Modified on 6/20/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2019 Filing 181 Brief of Amicus Curiae filed byUnited States House of Representatives. (Letter, Douglas) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 179 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Counsel is directed to file the Houses amicus curiae brief on the docket in this matter. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 179 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by United States House of Representatives. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 178 Renotice motion hearing re 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Sections 284, 8005, and 9002 filed byState of California. (Related document(s) 176 ) (Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 177 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must notice not re-file the 176 motion for partial summary judgment. Counsel is directed to review the 174 scheduling order and the 175 minute order before noticing the motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by State of California, State of New Mexico. Responses due by 6/19/2019. Replies due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff States of California and New Mexico's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Sections 284, 8005, and 9002, # 2 Appendix Appendix of Declarations re Enviromental Harms in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Sections 284, 8005, and 9002, # 3 Plaintiff States of California and New Mexico's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Sections 284, 8005, and 9002)(Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 6/12/2019) Modified on 6/13/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2019 Set Additional Deadlines/Hearing, See Docket No. 174 in case no. 19- cv-872-HSG and 164 in case no. 19-cv-892-HSG: Motions due by 7/11/2019; Responses due by 7/25/2019; Replies due by 8/8/2019 and Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019) Modified on 6/7/2019 (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due by 6/12/2019; Responses due by 6/19/2019 and Replies due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/7/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 173 NOTICE of Filing of Administrative Record For El Paso, Yuma, El Centro, and Tucson Border Barrier Projects by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Steven T. Mnuchin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Patrick M. Shanahan, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 6/7/2019) Modified on 6/10/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2019 Filing 175 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/5/2019. FTR Time: 2:01-2:27. Plaintiff Attorney: Dror Ladin, Lee Sherman, Gavion McCabe, Craig Newby and Justin Sullivan appearing via courtcall. Defendant Attorney: Andrew Warden appearing via courtcall. The Court orders the current preliminary injunction motion and briefing held in abeyance and orders that the motion for partial summary judgment briefing concerning Sections 284 and 8005 include issues raised in the pending preliminary injunction motion. The Court sets: June 12-filing deadline for motion for partial summary judgment and August 29, 2019 at 2:00 p.m.-hearing deadline for motion for summary judgment on remaining issues. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by Sparsh S Khandeshi (Khandeshi, Sparsh) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah Marc Golden-Krasner for Plaintiff State of California (Golden-Krasner, Noah) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Jeffrey Bilford (Bilford, Brian) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 169 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Steven T. Mnuchin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Patrick M. Shanahan, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson, State of Colorado, et al. (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 5/31/2019) Modified on 6/3/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 166 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 ***Hearing dates of 10/3/2019 Re Docket Nos. 167 in case no. 19-cv-00872-hsg and 146 and 150 in case no. 19-cv-00892-HSG are terminated because counsel set the date when filing the motions in ECF but failed to actual notice the motions for that date.*** (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to 167 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , See Docket No. 163 : Responses due by 6/10/2019 and Replies due by 6/13/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 167 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of California. Responses due by 10/10/2019. Replies due by 10/15/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Declaration of Kevin B. Clark, # 3 Declaration of Nagano, # 4 Declaration of Dunn, # 5 Declaration of Vanderplank, # 6 Proposed Order, # 7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cayaban, Michael) (Filed on 5/29/2019) Modified on 5/30/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2019 Filing 166 Joint MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Steven T. Mnuchin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Patrick M. Shanahan, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Stephen I. Vladeck, Heather Wilson., State of California (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Westmoreland, Rachael) (Filed on 5/29/2019) Modified on 5/30/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2019 Set Deadline/Hearing: Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2019 and Further Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., DENYING 59 Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and SETTING case management conference for June 5, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Case management statement is due by May 31, 2019.(hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 164 ***INCORRECT CASE NUMBER*** TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/17/2019 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019) Modified on 5/24/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearing: Motions due by 5/29/2019; Responses due by 6/10/2019 and Replies due by 6/13/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting (Docket Nos. 162 in case 4:19-cv-00872-HSG and 140 in case 4:19-cv-00892-HSG) Stipulation For Supplemental Briefing Schedule For El Centro and Tucson Border Barrier Projects. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 162 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Supplemental Briefing Schedule For El Centro and Tucson Border Barrier Projects filed by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Steven T. Mnuchin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Patrick M. Shanahan, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 5/22/2019) Modified on 5/23/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2019 Filing 161 Letter from Douglas N. Letter, General Counsel, U.S. House of Representatives . (Letter, Douglas) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 149 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Margaret Q. Chapple.( 123 Motion for Pro Hac Vice is terminated) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 159 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/17/19, before Judge Gilliam. Court Reporter Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (156 in 4:19-cv-00872-HSG) Transcript Order, (137 in 4:19-cv-00892-HSG) Transcript Order, (158 in 4:19-cv-00872-HSG) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 6/10/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2019. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 158 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 17, 2019 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by United States House of Representatives, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Letter, Douglas) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 19, 2019 Filing 157 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 17, 2019 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Steven T. Mnuchin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Patrick M. Shanahan, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 5/19/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 156 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/17/2019 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by State of California, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 155 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 5/17/2019. Total Time in Court: 2 hours and 40 minutes. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo-Hebel. Plaintiff Attorney: Dror Ladin; Lee Sherman; Janelle Smith; Henry Kantor and Douglas Letter. Defendant Attorney: Andrew Warden; Eric Grant and James Burnham. Plaintiffs motions for preliminary injunction (docket nos. 59 in case no. 19- cv-872-HSG and 29 in case no. 19-cv-892-HSG) are argued and submitted by the parties and taken under submission by the Court. Parties are in agreement that the Court should rule on the motions for preliminary injunction without regard to the El Centro Sector and Tucson Sector Projects. Parties are directed to meet and confer and e-file a stipulation and proposed order setting briefing schedule regarding these projects. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 126 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Benjamin P. Sisney.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting (Docket Nos. 148 in case 4:19-cv-00872-HSG and 129 in case 4:19-cv-00892-HSG ) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard Michael Garfield (Garfield, Howard) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 151 Response to the Court's May 13, 2019 Order 141 by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Steven T. Mnuchin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Patrick M. Shanahan, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 5/15/2019) Modified on 5/16/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by James Mahoney Burnham (Burnham, James) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 149 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Margaret Q. Chapple) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13320417.) Filing Fee Paid filed by State of Connecticut. (Chapple, Margaret) (Filed on 5/15/2019) Modified on 5/16/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/16/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2019 Filing 148 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Zachary Kolodin) filed by 58 Religious Organizations. Responses due by 5/29/2019. Replies due by 6/5/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kolodin, Zachary) (Filed on 5/15/2019) Modified on 5/16/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 114 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Phillip M. Spector. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 113 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re: Harold Hongju Koh.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 145 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that any member of the press wishing to listen by telephone to the motions hearings scheduled for May 17th shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements to do so. No one is permitted to record the hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Grant on behalf of Defendants (Grant, Eric) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 143 SECOND DECLARATION of Kenneth Rapuano (May 13, 2019) filed by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Steven T. Mnuchin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Patrick M. Shanahan, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Declaration of Kenneth Rapuano (dated May 13, 2019))(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 5/13/2019) Modified on 5/14/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., ADVISING Defendants that the Court's 141 requested statement should only include updated factual information, and should not include further legal argument. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT STATEMENT. (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Henry Tyler (Tyler, Robert) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 139 Brief of Former U.S. Government Officials as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byFormer U.S. Government Officials. (Hartnett, Kathleen) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 116 Consent MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants. Counsel is directed to file the brief on the docket. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 115 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Counsel is directed to file the brief on the docket. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 136 Second Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice re 59 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byCommonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, Dana Nessel, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 54 & 55)(Related document(s) 59 ) (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 5/10/2019) Modified on 5/13/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 125 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Bernstein, Richard. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 121 Amended Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Badat, Mohammed. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 120 Amended Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kolodin, Zachary. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 118 Amended Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Zalesin, Steven. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 117 Amended Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mangi, Adeel. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 127 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 129 Brief of Amici Curiae Federal Courts Scholars in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byErwin Chemerinsky, Michael C. Dorf, David A. Strauss, Stephen I. Vladeck. (Wydra, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 128 Brief of Former Members of Congress as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byAmici Curiae Former Members of Congress. (Winthrop, Douglas) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 127 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by John Bellinger, III, Richard Bernstein, Peter Keisler, Carter Phillips, Christopher Shays, Stanley Twardy, Christine Todd Whitman. Responses due by 5/22/2019. Replies due by 5/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Dollan, Matthew) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 126 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Benjamin P. Sisney) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13328079.) filed by American Center for Law and Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Sisney, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/8/2019) Modified on 5/9/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2019 Filing 125 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13325691.) Filing fee paid on 5/7/19 filed by John Bellinger, III, Richard Bernstein, Peter Keisler, Carter Phillips, Christopher Shays, Stanley Twardy, Christine Todd Whitman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bernstein, Richard) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2019 Filing 124 Brief Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction filed byNational Immigration Law Center, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-AAJC, Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Los Angeles, AALDEFF, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, LatinoJustice PRLDEF. (Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2019 Filing 123 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Margaret Q. Chapple) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13320417.) filed by State of Connecticut. (Chapple, Margaret) (Filed on 5/6/2019) Modified on 5/7/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2019 Filing 122 Amicus Brief filed by National Immigration Law Center, et al. (Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/3/2019) Modified on 5/3/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2019 Filing 121 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13309778.) Filing fee previously paid on 05/01/2019 filed by 58 Religious Organizations. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Badat, Mohammed) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 120 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13309770.) Filing fee previously paid on 05/01/2019 filed by 58 Religious Organizations. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kolodin, Zachary) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting (Docket Nos. 103 in case 4:19-cv-00872-HSG; 79 in case 4:19-cv-00892-HSG) Motion for Leave to File as Amici Curiae. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 118 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13309762.) Filing fee previously paid on 05/01/2019 filed by 58 Religious Organizations. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Zalesin, Steven) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 117 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13309746.) Filing fee previously paid on 05/01/2019 filed by 58 Religious Organizations. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mangi, Adeel) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 116 Consent MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants filed by American Center for Law and Justice. Responses due by 5/16/2019. Replies due by 5/23/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sisney, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/2/2019) Modified on 5/3/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2019 Filing 115 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Former U.S. Government Officials. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hartnett, Kathleen) (Filed on 5/2/2019) Modified on 5/3/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2019 Filing 114 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Phillip M. Spector ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13313986.) filed by Former U.S. Government Officials. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Spector, Phillip) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 113 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Harold Hongju Koh ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13313954.) filed by Former U.S. Government Officials. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Koh, Harold) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 112 REPLY (re 59 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byCommonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, Dana Nessel, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice & Exhibits. 51-53)(Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., GRANTING the 110 motion for leave to present argument, in light of the unique institutional interests articulated by amicus curiae United States House of Representatives. No party arguing at the hearing will be permitted to present PowerPoint or similar visual presentations. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 110 MOTION for Leave to Present Argument in the Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by United States House of Representatives. Responses due by 5/16/2019. Replies due by 5/23/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas) (Filed on 5/2/2019) Modified on 5/3/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2019 Filing 109 Brief of 58 Religious Organizations as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' 59 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by 58 Religious Organizations. (Lafayette, Gary) (Filed on 5/2/2019) Modified on 5/2/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2019 Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Document also listed case number 4:19-cv-892-HSG. If it is intended to be applied to the other case number, please e-file in tha t case also. If the document is not applicable to that case, DO NOT include that case number on the document. Re: 104 Notice of Appearance filed by National Immigration Law Center, et al. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting Consent (Docket Nos. 105 in case 4:19-cv-00872-HSG; and 68 in case 4:19-cv-00892-HSG) MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 98 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of 58 Religious Organizations as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 95 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Former Members of Congress as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Document also listed case number 4:19-cv-892-HSG. If it is intended to be applied to the other case number, please e-file in tha t case also. If the document is not applicable to that case, DO NOT include that case number on the document. [err102] Re: 103 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae filed by National Immigration Law Center, et al. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 105 Consent MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Erwin Chemerinsky, Michael C. Dorf, David A. Strauss, Stephen I. Vladeck. Responses due by 5/16/2019. Replies due by 5/23/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Wydra, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas David Espiritu (Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 103 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae filed by National Immigration Law Center, et al.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 102 **RE-FILED AT DOCKET NO. 121 ** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13309778.) filed by 58 Religious Organizations. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Badat, Mohammed) (Filed on 5/1/2019) Modified on 5/3/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2019 Filing 101 **RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. 120 ** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13309770.) filed by 58 Religious Organizations. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kolodin, Zachary) (Filed on 5/1/2019) Modified on 5/3/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2019 Filing 100 **DISREGARD, RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. 118 ** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13309762.) filed by 58 Religious Organizations. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Zalesin, Steven) (Filed on 5/1/2019) Modified on 5/3/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2019 Filing 99 **RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. 117 ** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13309746.) filed by 58 Religious Organizations. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mangi, Adeel) (Filed on 5/1/2019) Modified on 5/3/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2019 Filing 98 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of 58 Religious Organizations as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by 58 Religious Organizations. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lafayette, Gary) (Filed on 5/1/2019) Modified on 5/2/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary T. Lafayette. (Lafayette, Gary) (Filed on 5/1/2019) Modified on 5/2/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2019 Filing 96 **DISREGARD, RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. 97 ** NOTICE of Appearance by Gary T. Lafayette [Notice of Appearance of Counsel] (Lafayette, Gary) (Filed on 5/1/2019) Modified on 5/2/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2019 Filing 95 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Former Members of Congress as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Amici Curiae Former Members of Congress. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Amici Curiae Brief)(Winthrop, Douglas) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 88 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Dollan, Matthew. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 86 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Hussein, Shaimaa. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 85 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mancino, Richard. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 91 Amicus Brief filed byJohn Bellinger, III, Richard Bernstein, Peter Keisler, Carter Phillips, Christopher Shays, Stanley Twardy, Christine Todd Whitman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Amicus Brief of Christopher Shays, Christine Todd Whitman, Peter Keisler, Carter Phillips, John Bellinger III, Stanley Twardy and Richard Bernstein as Amici Curiae)(Evans, David) (Filed on 4/30/2019) Modified on 5/1/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., DIRECTING defense counsel to submit two complete copies of exhibits to 89 opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction by May 1, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 89 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 59 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Steven T. Mnuchin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Patrick M. Shanahan, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 88 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13290110.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/25/19 filed by John Bellinger, III, Richard Bernstein, Peter Keisler, Carter Phillips, Christopher Shays, Stanley Twardy, Christine Todd Whitman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dollan, Matthew) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting (Docket Nos. 84 in case 4:19-cv-00872-HSG and 59 in case 4:19-cv-00892-HSG) MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of 59 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Counsel is directed to file the amici curiae brief of Christopher Shays et al. on the docket in this matter. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 86 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13290005.) filed by John Bellinger, III, Richard Bernstein, Peter Keisler, Carter Phillips, Christopher Shays, Stanley Twardy, Christine Todd Whitman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hussein, Shaimaa) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 85 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13289928.) filed by John Bellinger, III, Richard Bernstein, Peter Keisler, Carter Phillips, Christopher Shays, Stanley Twardy, Christine Todd Whitman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Mancino, Richard) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 24, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of 59 Motion for Preliminary Injunction CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 81 , 82 , 83 filed by John Bellinger, III, Richard Bernstein, Peter Keisler, Carter Phillips, Christopher Shays, Stanley Twardy, Christine Todd Whitman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Memorandum, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Evans, David) (Filed on 4/24/2019) Modified on 4/24/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2019 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct event is "Motion for Leave to File Document." Event can be found under Civil Events > Motions and Rel ated Filings > Motions - General > Leave to File Document. ALSO, please attach all supporting documents and proposed orders to the Motion. Please re-file the motion using the correct event with all supporting documents as attachments in its entirety. Re: 81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Consent Motion For Leave filed by Stanley Twardy, Carter Phillips, Peter Keisler, Christine Todd Whitman, Richard Bernstein, Christopher Shays, John Bellinger, III, 82 Exhibits, filed by Stanley Twardy, Carter Phillips, Peter Keisler, Christine Todd Whitman, Richard Bernstein, Christopher Shays, John Bellinger, III, 83 Proposed Order, filed by Stanley Twardy, Carter Phillips, Peter Keisler, Christine Todd Whitman, Richard Bernstein, Christopher Shays, John Bellinger, III (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 24, 2019 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct Event is "Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice." Event can be found under Civil Events > Motions a nd Related Filings > Motions - General > Pro Hac Vice. The attorney requesting to appear pro hac vice must also file their own Motion using their own ECF login .Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 78 Amicus Curiae Appearance filed by Stanley Twardy, Carter Phillips, Peter Keisler, Christine Todd Whitman, Richard Bernstein, Christopher Shays, John Bellinger, III, 80 Amicus Curiae Appearance filed by Stanley Twardy, Carter Phillips, Peter Keisler, Christine Todd Whitman, Richard Bernstein, Christopher Shays, John Bellinger, III, 79 Amicus Curiae Appearance filed by Stanley Twardy, Carter Phillips, Peter Keisler, Christine Todd Whitman, Richard Bernstein, Christopher Shays, John Bellinger, III. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 83 ***DISREGARD, RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. 84 *** Proposed Order re 81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Consent Motion For Leave Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of Christopher Shays, et al. by John Bellinger, III, Richard Bernstein, Peter Keisler, Carter Phillips, Christopher Shays, Stanley Twardy, Christine Todd Whitman. (Evans, David) (Filed on 4/23/2019) Modified on 4/24/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2019 Filing 82 **DISREGARD, RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. 84 *** EXHIBITS re 81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Consent Motion For Leave Amicus Memorandum In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Prelimary Injunction filed byJohn Bellinger, III, Richard Bernstein, Peter Keisler, Carter Phillips, Christopher Shays, Stanley Twardy, Christine Todd Whitman. (Related document(s) 81 ) (Evans, David) (Filed on 4/23/2019) Modified on 4/24/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2019 Filing 81 ***DISREGARD, RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. 84 *** MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Consent Motion For Leave filed by John Bellinger, III, Richard Bernstein, Peter Keisler, Carter Phillips, Christopher Shays, Stanley Twardy, Christine Todd Whitman. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/7/2019. Replies due by 5/14/2019. (Evans, David) (Filed on 4/23/2019) Modified on 4/24/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2019 Filing 80 **RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. 88 ** Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by David W. Evans on behalf of John Bellinger, III, Richard Bernstein, Peter Keisler, Carter Phillips, Christopher Shays, Stanley Twardy, Christine Todd Whitman. (Evans, David) (Filed on 4/23/2019) Modified on 4/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2019 Filing 79 **RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. 86 ** Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by David W. Evans on behalf of John Bellinger, III, Richard Bernstein, Peter Keisler, Carter Phillips, Christopher Shays, Stanley Twardy, Christine Todd Whitman. (Evans, David) (Filed on 4/23/2019) Modified on 4/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2019 Filing 78 **RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. 85 ** Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by David W. Evans on behalf of John Bellinger, III, Richard Bernstein, Peter Keisler, Carter Phillips, Christopher Shays, Stanley Twardy, Christine Todd Whitman. (Evans, David) (Filed on 4/23/2019) Modified on 4/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Evans (Evans, David) (Filed on 4/23/2019) Modified on 4/24/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting (Docket Nos. 74 in case 4:19-cv-00872-HSG and 48 in case 4:19-cv-00892-HSG) Joint Administrative Motion for Relief from Automatic Referral to the ADR Multi-Option Program. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 69 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Feigenbaum, Jeremy. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 22, 2019 Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Document also listed case number 4:19-cv-892-HSG. If it is intended to be applied to the other case number, please e-file in that case also. If the document is not applicable to that case, DO NOT include that case number on the document. [err102] Re: 74 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION RELIEF FROM AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO THE ADR MULTI-OPTION PROGRAM re 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, filed by State of California (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 74 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Relief from Automatic Referral to the ADR Multi-Option Program re 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, filed by State of California and all Defendants. Responses due by 4/23/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 4/19/2019) Modified on 4/22/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2019 Filing 73 Brief of Amicus Curiae filed byUnited States House of Representatives. (Letter, Douglas) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 71 Consent Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Houses counsel is directed to file the amicus curiae brief on the docket in this matter. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 71 Consent MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by United States House of Representatives. Responses due by 4/26/2019. Replies due by 5/3/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Amicus Brief)(Letter, Douglas) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter (Letter, Douglas) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 69 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13252197.) filed by State of New Jersey. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing)(Feigenbaum, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting (Docket Nos. 67 in case 4:19-cv-00872-HSG and 42 in case 4:19-cv-00892-HSG) Stipulation For Order Extending Page Limits For Preliminary Injunction Briefs, Staying Defendants' Response to the Amended Complaints, and Staying Initial Case Management Activity. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Order Extending Page Limits For Preliminary Injunction Briefs, Staying Defendants' Response to the Amended Complaints, and Staying Initial Case Management Activity filed by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Steven T. Mnuchin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Patrick M. Shanahan, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson, and all Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 4/10/2019) Modified on 4/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Irwin Warden on behalf of Defendants (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California re 47 Amended Complaint,, (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California re [ECF Doc. 63] (Ochoa, Edward) (Filed on 4/10/2019) Modified on 4/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 59 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, See Docket No. 63 : Responses due by 4/25/2019; Replies due by 5/2/2019; and Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2019 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Hon Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. SETTING the following briefing and hearing schedule for Plaintiffs' 59 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: responses are due by April 25, 2019; replies are due by May 2, 2019; a hearing is scheduled for May 17, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs' 60 Motion to Shorten Time is DENIED AS MOOT in light of this order. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to serve Defendants with this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Taylor, Abigail. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 61 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re- file the 59 motion for preliminary injunction. Hearing date of May 9, 2019, is vacated. Response is due April 22nd and reply is due April 29th. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. May 9th was not the Court's next available hearing date when this motion was e-filed. If the motion to shorten time is granted, the Court will advance the briefing and/or the hearing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Plaintiff States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Lee I. Sherman, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, Dana Nessel, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Wisconsin. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 4/18/2019. Replies due by 4/25/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Appendix re Environmental Harms, # 3 Appendix re TFF Harms, # 4 Request for Judicial Notice and Exhibits 1-50, # 5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 57 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To enlarge page limits in support of motion for injunctive relief. Plaintiff States shall immediately file a Motion for Preliminary Injunction up to 35 pages in length on the docket. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 57 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To enlarge page limits in support of motion for injunctive relief filed by State of California. Responses due by 4/18/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Lee Sherman, # 3 Notice of Motion & Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Appendix of Declarations re: TFF, # 6 Appendix of Declarations re: Environmental, # 7 Request for Judicial Notice, # 8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13233071.) filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Taylor, Abigail) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Battles, Benjamin. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 54 AFFIDAVIT by State of California. (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13182042.) filed by State of Vermont. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Battles, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #50 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sullivan, Justin. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Johnson-Karp, Gabe. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13174333.) filed by State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letters of Good Standing)(Sullivan, Justin) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 14, 2019 #Electronic filing error. The #48 Proposed Summons will not be issued as to the same Defendants listed on the summons issued at docket number #6 , unless those summons' are returned unexecuted. Also, the Clerk's Office will issue a maximum of 3 summons'. Either list all defendants on three summons' or list any additional defendants as an attachment to the proposed summons. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13170489.) filed by State of Wisconsin. (Johnson-Karp, Gabe) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 48 Proposed Summons. (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 47 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants. Filed byState of Minnesota, State of Colorado, State of California, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of Nevada, State of New York, Commonwealth of Virginia, Dana Nessel, State of Maine, State of Connecticut, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of New Jersey, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Wisconsin, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Vermont, State of Rhode Island. (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Restuccia, B. Eric. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #38 Motion to Relate Case Pursuant to N.D. Cal. Civ. L.R. 3-12(b) Re Case No. 19-cv-0892-KAW. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13144599.) filed by Dana Nessel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Restuccia, B. Eric) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey Paul Dunlap. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #39 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kantor, Henry. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Colleen Leslie as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Leslie, Heather) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13134628.) filed by State of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dunlap, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13120842.) Filing fee previously paid on 02/25/2019 filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kantor, Henry) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to N.D. Cal. Civ. L.R. 3-12(b) filed by Sierra Club, Southern Border Communities Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cecillia D. Wang, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Cecillia D. Wang, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Cecillia D. Wang, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Wang, Cecillia) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 37 RE-FILED AT DOCKET NO. #39 ** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13120842.) filed by State of Oregon. (DeFever, Jeanne) (Filed on 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Janelle M. Smith on behalf of Plaintiff State of California (Smith, Janelle) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jones, Brittany.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for May 21, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by May 14, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-00872-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Stern, Heidi. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lyons, David. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Meyer, Amanda. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Colangelo, Matthew.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:19-cv-00872- HSG . Re: #28 Notice of Appearance filed by State of California (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019) Modified on 2/22/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13113196.) filed by Commonwealth of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Good Standing Certificate)(Jones, Brittany) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Zahradka, II on behalf of Plaintiff State of California (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 27 Refund Status re #11 Application for Refund, APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13111002.) filed by State of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Stern, Heidi) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13110771.) filed by State of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Lyons, David) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13110536.) filed by State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Meyer, Amanda) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13107289.) filed by State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Colangelo, Matthew) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Henry Ochoa as Counsel for Plaintiff State of California (Ochoa, Edward) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/20/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Chuang on behalf of Plaintiff State of California (Chuang, Christine) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by State of California.. (Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Caleb Andrew Rush (Rush, Caleb) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #12 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #9 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #7 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Phillip Cayaban (Cayaban, Michael) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13103252.) filed by State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Olson, Eric) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 26FGOHCE by Commonwealth of Virginia, Dana Nessel, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon. (Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gavin Geraghty McCabe (McCabe, Gavin) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13102823.) filed by State of Minnesota. (Campion, Jacob) (Filed on 2/19/2019) Modified on 2/20/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #4 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13102243.) filed by State of Maine. (Herman, Susan) (Filed on 2/19/2019) Modified on 2/20/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Steven T. Mnuchin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Patrick M. Shanahan, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson, U.S. Department of Justice, Civil Process Clerk U.S. Attorney's Office. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/19/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13101792.) filed by State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Maestas, Tania) (Filed on 2/19/2019) Modified on 2/20/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/5/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 18, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by State of Delaware, State of Maine, State of Hawaii, D ana Nessel, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of California, State of New Jersey, State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Oregon, State of Maryland, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Colorado Attorney Lee Isaac Sherman does not represent all plaintiffs just the State of California Only. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2019)
February 18, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by State of Delaware, State of Maine, State of Hawaii, D ana Nessel, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of California, State of New Jersey, State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Oregon, State of Maryland, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Colorado Not a Civil Miscellaneous Case (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2019)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 2/18/2019)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13100729.). Filed byState of New York, State of Minnesota, State of Colorado, State of California, Dana Nessel, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Connecticut, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of New Jersey, State of Delaware, State of Nevada, State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 2/18/2019) Modified on 2/19/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13100729.). Filed byState of New York, State of Minnesota, State of Colorado, State of California, Dana Nessel, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Connecticut, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of New Jersey, State of Delaware, State of Nevada, State of Hawaii, Commonwealth of Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 2/18/2019) Modified on 2/19/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/19/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Lee Isaac Sherman
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Campion
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Represented By: Lee Isaac Sherman
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Dunlap
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Lee Isaac Sherman
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Lee Isaac Sherman
Represented By: Tania Maestas
Represented By: Matthew L. Garcia
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Attorney General Dana Nessel
Represented By: Lee Isaac Sherman
Represented By: B. Eric Restuccia
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nevada
Represented By: Lee Isaac Sherman
Represented By: Heidi Parry Stern
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: Lee Isaac Sherman
Represented By: Jeanne Nicole DeFever
Represented By: Henry Kantor
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Lee Isaac Sherman
Represented By: Michelle S. Kallen
Represented By: Brittany Marie Jones
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado
Represented By: Lee Isaac Sherman
Represented By: Eric Reuel Olson
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois
Represented By: Lee Isaac Sherman
Represented By: Caleb Andrew Rush
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii
Represented By: Lee Isaac Sherman
Represented By: Clyde James Wadsworth
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware
Represented By: Lee Isaac Sherman
Represented By: David Jay Lyons
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maine
Represented By: Lee Isaac Sherman
Represented By: Susan P. Herman
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Lee Isaac Sherman
Represented By: Matthew Coangelo
Represented By: Gavin Geraghty McCabe
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Amanda Meyer
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Lee Isaac Sherman
Represented By: Jeremy Feigenbaum
Represented By: Jeremy Feigenbaum,
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Lee Isaac Sherman
Represented By: Michael Phillip Cayaban
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Represented By: Janelle M. Smith
Represented By: Edward Henry Ochoa
Represented By: Heather Colleen Leslie
Represented By: Christine Chuang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Represented By: Benjamin Daniel Battles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Represented By: Gabe Johnson-Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Represented By: Justin James Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Mnuchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T. Esper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard V. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick M. Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Southern Border Communities Coalition
Represented By: Cecillia Derphine Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sierra Club
Represented By: Cecillia Derphine Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?