Reiland et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Harold P Reiland, Jr. and Melinda P Reiland
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01084
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #14 Stipulation Extension of Time for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Respond to Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Extension of Time for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Respond to Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Harold P. Reiland, Jr., and Melinda P. Reiland. (Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 4/5/2019) Modified on 4/8/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re 12 Clerk's Notice,, (Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for June 4, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by May 28, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-01084-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Clerk on 03/11/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/21/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION For Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Harold P. Reiland, Jr. Melinda P. Reiland. (Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 3/4/2019) Modified on 3/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Edward Addiego, III (Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/14/2019. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa County Superior Court. Their case number is MSC19-00281. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13128342). Filed byJPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 2/27/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reiland et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Monder Khoury
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold P Reiland, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Marie Phair
Represented By: Jason W. Estavillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda P Reiland
Represented By: Caitlin Marie Phair
Represented By: Jason W. Estavillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?