Facebook, Inc. et al v. 9 Xiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc. and Instagram, LLC
Defendant: Wei Gao, 9 Xiu Network Science and Technology (Shenzhen) Company Ltd., Zhaoping Liu, Zhaochun Liu, Liu Zhoaping, Jiuxiu Network Science and Technology, 9 Xiufei Book Technology Co., Ltd., Gao Wei, Home Network (Fujian) Technology Co., Ltd., 9 Xiu Feishu Science and Technology Company Ltd., Liu Zhaochun, 9 Xiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd., Jiuxiu Network and Jiuxiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01167
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Referring Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Filing 76 Supplemental Brief re #73 Order, #67 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to 9 Xiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd., Wei Gao, and Zhaochun Liu filed byFacebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Related document(s) #73 , #67 ) (Lauridsen, Steven) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Continue Deadline to Submit Additional Evidence of Defendants' Contacts with California signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #74 Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 74 MOTION to Continue Deadline Set by ECF No. 73 From September 6, 2021 to September 20, 2021 filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Steven E. Lauridsen)(Lauridsen, Steven) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse Re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
July 9, 2021 Filing 72 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),. Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argu ment at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than October 25, 2021 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Vide oconference Only. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #70 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference to October 26, 2021.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 70 Tenth MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference to October 26, 2021 filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Steven E. Lauridsen)(Lauridsen, Steven) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
June 9, 2021 Motion for Default Judgment #67 is assigned to Magistrate Judge Tse for Report and Recommendations. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 7, 2021. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC re #67 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to 9 Xiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd., Wei Gao, and Zhaochun Liu (Lauridsen, Steven) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 67 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to 9 Xiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd., Wei Gao, and Zhaochun Liu filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 6/21/2021. Replies due by 6/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Default Judgment, #2 Declaration of Michael P. Duffey, #3 Exhibit A - Facebook Terms, #4 Exhibit B - Commercial Terms, #5 Exhibit C - Instagram Terms, #6 Declaration of Steven E. Lauridsen, #7 Exhibit A - Google TOS, #8 Exhibit B - YouTube TOS, #9 Exhibit C - LinkedIn User Agreement, #10 Exhibit D - Apple TOS, #11 Exhibit E - Pinterest TOS, #12 Exhibit F - Google CA SOS Filing, #13 Exhibit G - YouTube CA SOS Filing, #14 Exhibit H - LinkedIn CA SOS Filing)(Lauridsen, Steven) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #65 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 65 Ninth MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Steven E. Lauridsen)(Lauridsen, Steven) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
February 3, 2021 Filing 64 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to 9 Xiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd. also known as Jiuxiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Related documents(s) #63 )(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 2, 2021 Filing 63 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant 9 Xiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd. filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven E. Lauridsen)(Lauridsen, Steven) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #61 Plaintiffs' Eighth Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 14, 2021 Filing 61 Eighth MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Steven E. Lauridsen)(Lauridsen, Steven) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC re #1 Complaint,,, #15 Summons Issued, #59 Order on Report and Recommendations on January 8, 2021 by Email per Court Order (Lauridsen, Steven) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar ADOPTING #57 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC re #57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #49 Second MOTION for Leave to Serve Defendants 9 Xiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd. a/k/a Jiuxiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd. and ZhaoPing Liu a/k/a Liu ZhaoPing by Email filed by Insta (No Objections to Report and Recommendations) (Lauridsen, Steven) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 17, 2020 Filing 57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Grant In Part Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Authorize Service by E-Mail by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Objections due by 12/31/2020. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 56 Supplemental Brief re #55 Order Requesting Supplemental Briefing Regarding Motion for Alternative Service filed byFacebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven E. Lauridsen, #2 Exhibit 1 - Screenshot of facebook88.net)(Related document(s) #55 ) (Lauridsen, Steven) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse requesting Additional Supplemental Briefing on #49 Facebook's Renewed Motion to Serve Certain Defendants by E-mail. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 54 Supplemental Brief re #53 Order re Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Leave to Serve Through Alternative Means filed byFacebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mai Ming Hui (Second Supplemental))(Related document(s) #53 ) (Steele, David) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse requesting Supplemental Briefing on #49 Facebook's Renewed Motion to Serve Certain Defendants by E-mail. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #51 Seventh Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/19/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 51 Seventh MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Steven E. Lauridsen)(Steele, David) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 1, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 49 Second MOTION for Leave to Serve Defendants 9 Xiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd. a/k/a Jiuxiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd. and ZhaoPing Liu a/k/a Liu ZhaoPing by Email filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/14/2020. Replies due by 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Mai Ming Hui (Supplemental))(Steele, David) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar adopting Report and Recommendations as to #45 Report and Recommendations.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 47 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Wei Gao and Zhaochun Liu on August 13, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar adopting Report and Recommendations as to #44 . (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Deny #41 Plaintiffs' Motion to Authorize Servce on Certain Defendants by E-Mail by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Objections due by 8/11/2020. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 44 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Grant #35 Plaintiffs' Motion to Enter Default Against Certain Defendants by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Objections due by 8/11/2020. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #42 Motion to Continue. Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 7, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jstlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
July 7, 2020 Filing 42 Sixth MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Steven E. Lauridsen)(Steele, David) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 41 Amended MOTION for Leave to Serve Defendants 9 Xiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd. a/k/a Jiuxiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd. and ZhaoPing Liu a/k/a Liu ZhaoPing by Email re #36 MOTION for Leave to Serve Defendant 9 Xiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd. a/k/a Jiuxiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd. by Email filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2020. Replies due by 7/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Steele, David) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 40 Declaration of Celeste Ingalls in Support of #38 Order, #35 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendants Wei Gao a/k/a Gao Wei; Zhaochun Liu a/k/a/ Liu ZhaoChun, and ZhaoPing Liu a/k/a Liu ZhaoPing (Supplemental Declaration) filed byFacebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Related document(s) #38 , #35 ) (Steele, David) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 39 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Entry of Default with Respect to Defendant ZhaoPing Liu Only but Not as to Wei Gao or ZhaoChun Liu (Steele, David) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Requesting Supplemental Submission #35 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 19, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse for Report and Recommendation (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 19, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Serve Defendant 9 Xiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd. a/k/a Jiuxiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd. by Email filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 6/24/2020. Replies due by 7/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Mai Ming Hui)(Steele, David) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendants Wei Gao a/k/a Gao Wei; Zhaochun Liu a/k/a/ Liu ZhaoChun, and ZhaoPing Liu a/k/a Liu ZhaoPing filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Celeste Ingalls, #3 Declaration of David J. Steele)(Steele, David) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #33 Motion to Continue. Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jstlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 33 Fifth MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of David J. Steele)(Steele, David) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to General Order 72, the case management conference currently scheduled for May 19, 2020, will proceed telephonically. No party need submit a request for telephonic appearance. Not later than 24 hours before the conference, the parties are ordered to email the courtroom deputy a conference call number at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov. All counsel and/or parties representing themselves must be on the line at 2:00 p.m., ready to proceed when called. The Court usually schedules more than one case management conference at the same time, and thanks the parties and counsel in advance for their patience. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #30 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 30 Fourth MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of David J. Steele)(Steele, David) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Steele, David) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #26 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 26 Third MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of David J. Steele, #3 Declaration of Celeste Ingalls)(Steele, David) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case management conference previously set for 9/16/19 is continued. Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 24 Second MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Celeste Ingalls, #3 Declaration of David J. Steele)(Steele, David) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 23 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION CHANGE FOR JUDGE JON S. TIGAR Effective August 26, 2019:Judge Jon S. Tigar's courtroom and chambers will be located at the Ronald V. Dellums Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612.On or after the effective date, all court appearances, filings, and deliveries of chambers copies must be made at the Oakland Courthouse (https://cand.uscourts.gov/locations). For updated scheduling information, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/jst. Judge Tigar's case assignments will be updated to reflect the correct office assignment (for example: 3:19-cv-00123-JST will now be 4:19-cv-00123-JST). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecgS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The Case Management Conference set for 6/5/19 has been continued to 9/16/19. Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2019 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference and All Related Dates filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Celeste Ingalls, #2 Declaration of David J. Steele, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Steele, David) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Defendant Zhaoping Liu. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Defendant Zhaochun Liu. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Defendant Wei Gao. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Defendant Home Network (Fujian) Technology Co., Ltd.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Defendant 9 Xiufei Book Technology Co., Ltd.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Defendant 9 Xiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Defendant 9 Xiu Feishu Science and Technology Company Ltd.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #(1) Standing Order for All Civil Cases Before District Judge Jon S. Tigar, #(2) Standing Order for All Judges, #(3) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 Case assigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a patent or trademark infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Trademark and Service Mark Infringement; False Designation of Origin; Dilution; Cybersquatting; and Breach of Contract; Demand for Trial by Jury against 9 Xiu Feishu Science and Technology Company Ltd., 9 Xiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd., 9 Xiufei Book Technology Co., Ltd., Wei Gao, Home Network (Fujian) Technology Co., Ltd., Zhaochun Liu, Zhaoping Liu, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13136764). Filed by Instagram, LLC & Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steele, David) (Filed on 3/1/2019) Modified on 3/4/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 9 Xiu Feishu Science and Technology Company Ltd., 9 Xiu Network Science and Technology (Shenzhen) Company Ltd., 9 Xiufei Book Technology Co., Ltd., Wei Gao, Home Network (Fujian) Technology Co., Ltd., Zhaochun Liu, Zhaoping Liu ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13136764.). Filed byInstagram, LLC, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steele, David) (Filed on 3/1/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facebook, Inc. et al v. 9 Xiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wei Gao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9 Xiu Network Science and Technology (Shenzhen) Company Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhaoping Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhaochun Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liu Zhoaping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jiuxiu Network Science and Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9 Xiufei Book Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gao Wei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Network (Fujian) Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9 Xiu Feishu Science and Technology Company Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liu Zhaochun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9 Xiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jiuxiu Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jiuxiu Network (Shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: David Jefferson Steele
Represented By: Steven Erick Lauridsen
Represented By: Howard Alan Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Instagram, LLC
Represented By: David Jefferson Steele
Represented By: Steven Erick Lauridsen
Represented By: Howard Alan Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?