Facebook, Inc. v. Sluchevsky et al
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Defendant: Andrey Gorbachov and Gleb Sluchevsky
Case Number: 4:2019cv01277
Filed: March 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REASSIGNING AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT #25 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/28/2020. Objections due by 9/11/2020.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE re #29 Order via Memorandum in Support of Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David J. Steele)(Steele, David) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/11/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. The motion hearing at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1613661817?pwd=Z0tnSzBvKzJMN25SRFB3M1B6dFBadz09Meeting ID: 161 366 1817Password: 924619Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscou rts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #26 Motion to Continue. Further Case Management Conference reset for 10/22/2020 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 26 Sixth MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Steven E. Lauridsen)(Steele, David) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to All Claims Against All Defendants filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 7/23/2020. Replies due by 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction, #2 Declaration of Meghan Wleklinski, #3 Declaration of Steven E. Lauridsen)(Steele, David) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #23 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference reset for 7/23/2020 at 1:30 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 23 Fifth MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of David J. Steele)(Steele, David) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 22 Clerk's Notice Re: ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendants Gleb Sluchevsky and Andrey Gorbachov on March 13, 2020. (Related documents(s) #19 ) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #20 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference reset for 5/21/2020 0at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 12, 2020 Filing 20 Fourth MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of David J. Steele)(Steele, David) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
March 12, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Entry of Default for all Defendants filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Celeste Ingalls, #3 Declaration of David J. Steele)(Steele, David) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Due to the unavailability of the Court, the initial case management conference scheduled for March 12, 2020 is continued to March 26, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. The joint case management conference statement shall be filed by March 19, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Steele, David) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #15 Motion to Continue Continue Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2020. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/12/2020 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 Third MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of David J. Steele, #3 Declaration of Celeste Ingalls)(Steele, David) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #13 Motion to Continue. Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 Second MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of David J. Steele, #3 Declaration of Celeste Ingalls)(Steele, David) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #11 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference and All Related Dates. Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/5/2019 0at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference and All Related Dates filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Celeste Ingalls, #2 Declaration of David J. Steele, #3 Exhibit 1)(Steele, David) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Facebook, Inc... (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Andrey Gorbachov. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Gleb Sluchevsky. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/22/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Facebook, Inc. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrey Gorbachov, Gleb Sluchevsky ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13156448.). Filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steele, David) (Filed on 3/8/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facebook, Inc. v. Sluchevsky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrey Gorbachov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gleb Sluchevsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: David Jefferson Steele
Represented By: Steven Erick Lauridsen
Represented By: Howard Alan Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?