(PC) Anthony R. Turner v. Brown et al

Plaintiff: Anthony R. Turner
Defendant: J. Maldonado, N. Gonzalez, D. Lopez, Correctional Guard J. Lopez, Director Scott Kernan, T. Foss, E. Moore, D. Williams, W.L. Muniz and Attorney General Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01406
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC GRC
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Declaration filed by Anthony R. Turner. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2019: #1 Envelope) (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/2/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Anthony R. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Order to Show Cause and NOTICE to File Return After U.S.M.-285 Form Service After Screening Review "PROPOSED ORDER" by Anthony R. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 6/13/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthony R. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Anthony R. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Receipt of Case Transferred from the Eastern District of California. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00289. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 4/25/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 13, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Anthony R. Turner. (Hellings, J)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Transferring Case to the Northern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/13/2019. (Hellings, J)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Edmund G. Brown, Jr, T. Foss, N. Gonzalez, Scott Kernan, D. Lopez, J. Lopez, J. Maldonado, E. Moore, W.L. Muniz, D. Williams by Anthony R. Turner.(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Anthony R. Turner v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Guard J. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.L. Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony R. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?