Franco v. E-3 Systems
Plaintiff: Jose Franco
Defendant: E-3 Systems
Case Number: 4:2019cv01453
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the case management conference, previously set for June 25th, is continued to September 26, 2019, at 2:00 p.m., to be heard along with the #8 motion to remand, in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jose Franco, E-3 Systems. (Shkodnik, Roman) (Filed on 6/17/2019) Modified on 6/18/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #15 Motion to Appear by Telephone at 6/25/19 Case Management Conference.. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 12, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Judge name is incorrect on the proposed order signature line. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name as Hay wood S. Gilliam, Jr. on future filings. Re: #15 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at 6/25/19 Case Management Conference filed by E-3 Systems (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY (re #8 MOTION to Remand ) filed byJose Franco. (Shkodnik, Roman) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at 6/25/19 Case Management Conference filed by E-3 Systems. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elliott, Kevin) (Filed on 6/11/2019) Modified on 6/12/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Shkodnik, Roman) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant (Elliott, Kevin) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #11 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the Case Management Conference on June 25, 2019. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582- 6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the Case Management Conference on June 25, 2019 filed by Jose Franco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shkodnik, Roman) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION to Remand ) filed byE-3 Systems. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Elliott, Kevin) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand filed by Jose Franco. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 6/4/2019. Replies due by 6/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shkodnik, Roman) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for June 25, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by June 18, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-01453-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by the Clerk on 03/29/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by E-3 Systems.. (Elliott, Kevin) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 6/ 12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 20, 2019 Answer to Removal Complaint byE-3 Systems. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/3/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Plaintiff of Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1331 and 1441 from Superior Court of California for the County of Alameda. Their case number is RG19006981. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13188094). Filed by E-3 Systems, a California Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Albert Gonzalez, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Elliott, Kevin) (Filed on 3/20/2019) Modified on 3/21/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franco v. E-3 Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Franco
Represented By: Walter Lewis Haines
Represented By: Roman Shkodnik
Represented By: David Harmik Yeremian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-3 Systems
Represented By: Kevin Robert Elliott
Represented By: John Franklin McIntyre, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?