Tesla, Inc. v. Zoox, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Tesla, Inc.
Defendant: Zoox, Inc., Scott Turner, Craig Emigh, Christian Dement and Sydney Cooper
Case Number: 4:2019cv01462
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 43 STIPULATION FOR THE EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT CHRISTIAN DEMENT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Christian Dement, Tesla Inc. (Loweth, Christopher) (Filed on 7/8/2019) Modified on 7/9/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #41 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference filed by Zoox, Inc., Christian Dement, Scott Turner, Sydney Cooper, and Craig Emigh. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Alexia R. Brancato ISO Request for Order to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference)(Keegan, Christopher) (Filed on 7/2/2019) Modified on 7/3/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2019 Filing 40 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Loweth, Christopher) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 39 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed on behalf of Defendant Scott Turner (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 38 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed on behalf of Defendant Craig Emigh (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 37 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed on behalf of Defendant Sydney Cooper (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 36 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (McEldowney, Sean) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Judge initials are incorrect Re: #35 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options filed by Tesla, Inc. FOR FUTURE FILING c ounsel should reference the correct judge initials as PJH after the case number, and correctly reflected on your document as 4:19-cv-01462-PJH. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 35 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 34 STIPULATION for the Extension of Time for Defendants Zoox, Inc., Scott Turner, Sydney Cooper, and Craig Emigh to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Zoox, Inc., Scott Turner, Sydney Cooper, Craig Emigh, Tesla Inc. (Keegan, Christopher) (Filed on 6/28/2019) Modified on 7/1/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2019 Filing 33 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by James Cai (Cai, James) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 31 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Christian Dement, Tesla Inc. (Loweth, Christopher) (Filed on 6/17/2019) Modified on 6/18/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. Loweth (Loweth, Christopher) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tesla, Inc.. Service waived by Christian Dement waiver sent on 4/16/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Zoox, Inc., Tesla Inc, Scott Turner, Sydney Cooper, Craig Emigh. (Keegan, Christopher) (Filed on 5/28/2019) Modified on 5/29/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Zoox, Inc., Scott Turner, Sydner Cooper, Craig Emigh. (Keegan, Christopher) (Filed on 4/30/2019) Modified on 5/1/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2019 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by Zoox, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Zoox, Inc. for Zoox, Inc.. (Keegan, Christopher) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Alexia R. Brancato. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gregg F. LoCascio. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sean M. McEldowney. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Alexia R. Brancato ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13278430.) filed by Zoox, Inc.. (Brancato, Alexia) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Gregg F. LoCascio ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13278394.) filed by Zoox, Inc.. (LoCascio, Gregg) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Sean M. McEldowney ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13278249.) filed by Zoox, Inc.. (McEldowney, Sean) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Alan Patchen , Cheryl A. Cauley and Daniel P. Martin (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION for the Extension of Time for Defendants Zoox, Inc., Scott Turner, Sydney Cooper, and Craig Emigh to Answer, move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Zoox, Inc., Scott Turner, Sydney Cooper, Craig Emigh, Tesla Inc. (Keegan, Christopher) (Filed on 4/16/2019) Modified on 4/17/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher William Keegan (Keegan, Christopher) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tesla, Inc.. Sydney Cooper served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tesla, Inc.. Scott Turner served on 3/31/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 2, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Judge initials are incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge initials on future filings. Re: #14 Summons R eturned Executed filed by Tesla, Inc., #13 Summons Returned Executed filed by Tesla, Inc. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tesla, Inc.. Craig Emigh served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tesla, Inc.. Zoox, Inc. served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/25/19. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Clerk on 3/25/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Sydney Cooper, Christian Dement, Craig Emigh, Scott Turner, Zoox, Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/22/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tesla, Inc... (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lyndsey C. Heaton (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/4/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Tesla, Inc. . (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tesla, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tesla, Inc. Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13189261.). Filed byTesla, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 3/20/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tesla, Inc. v. Zoox, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoox, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher William Keegan
Represented By: Alexia Renee Brancato
Represented By: Sean Michael McEldowney
Represented By: Gregg LoCascio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Turner
Represented By: Daniel P. Martin
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Patchen
Represented By: Cheryl Ann Cauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Emigh
Represented By: Daniel P. Martin
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Patchen
Represented By: Cheryl Ann Cauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Dement
Represented By: Christopher W. Loweth
Represented By: James Cai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sydney Cooper
Represented By: Daniel P. Martin
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Patchen
Represented By: Cheryl Ann Cauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tesla, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary J. Alinder
Represented By: Lyndsey C. Heaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?