Equity Growth Asset Management v. Holden et al

Plaintiff: Equity Growth Asset Management
Defendant: Nancy Holden and Melvin Holden
Case Number: 4:2019cv01505
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 Receipt from San Francisco Superior Court Acknowledging Receipt of Remanded Case. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Remanding Case to San Francisco Superior Court. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND REMANDING ACTION. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S WHITE on 4/16/19. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 03/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to a district judge. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to remand case to state court. ORDER granting #3 , #4 Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to report and recommendation due by 4/11/2019. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/25/2019. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ivaS, COURTSTAFF).
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Melvin Holden, Nancy Holden (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nancy Holden. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Melvin Holden. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2019 1:30 PM at the Ronald Dellums Federal Building, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CUD-18-661918. (). Filed by Melvin Holden, Nancy Holden. Consent/Declination due by 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equity Growth Asset Management v. Holden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equity Growth Asset Management
Represented By: Jak Steven Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?