SETNIK v. FINAN'S AUTO SUPPLY, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SETNIK ROBERT and Robert Setnik
Defendant: FINAN'S AUTO SUPPLY, INC., Foster Wheeler LLC, Folsom Auto Supply, FOLSOM AUTO PARTS, Folsom Lumber and Building Supply, Inc., PUGET SOUND COMMERCE CENTER, INC. (FKA TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION) and FOLSOM BLVD. AUTO PARTS, INC.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01506
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/26/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/24/2019. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement Conference. Close of Expert Discovery due by 3/6/2020. Close of Fact Discovery due by 10/16/2019. Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2019. Daubert/Dispositive Motion filed by 11/15/2019. Motions filed by 11/15/2019. Opening Reports due by 1/24/2020. Rebuttal Reports due by 2/7/2020. Joint Statement re compliance hearing filed by 3/13/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. Jury Selection set for 4/27/2020 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Jury Trial set for 4/27/2020 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Daubert/Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement filed by 3/27/2020. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 4/10/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance hearing re pretrial preparation is set for Friday, 3/20/2020 09:01.Total Time in Court: 21 minutes. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/24/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Michael Rose (Rose, Jason) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 20 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & Proposed Order filed by Robert Setnik and Foster Wheeler LLC. (Chu, Kimberly) (Filed on 6/6/2019) Modified on 6/7/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Settlement Conference with a Magistrate Judge by Robert Setnik filed by Robert Setnik, Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc. (FKA Todd Shipyards Corporation) and Foster Wheeler LLC. (Chu, Kimberly) (Filed on 6/3/2019) Modified on 6/4/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2019 Filing 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Correction of Document No. 17 (Chu, Kimberly) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 17 ***DISREGARD. SEE DOCKET #18 FOR CORRECTED DOCUMENT.*** ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Chu, Kimberly) (Filed on 5/31/2019) Modified on 6/3/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Janine Marie Fiel-Cosse (Fiel-Cosse, Janine) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 6/24/2019 02:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Robert Setnik of Withdrawal of Appearance By Nancy T. WIlliams (Donadio, David) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Joy Wai Jun Chu and David R. Donadio (Chu, Kimberly) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amec Foster Wheeler plc, for Foster Wheeler LLC. wholly-owned indirect subsidiary of Amec Foster Wheeler plc (Park, Charles) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
April 1, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #10 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Foster Wheeler LLC (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS ANSWER to Complaint FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS byFoster Wheeler LLC. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Foster Wheeler LLC wholly-owned indirect subsidiary of Amec Foster Wheeler plc (Park, Charles) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Foster Wheeler LLC.. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Park for DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (Park, Charles) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND byPUGET SOUND COMMERCE CENTER, INC. (FKA TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION). (Steele, Demian) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 3/26/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by PUGET SOUND COMMERCE CENTER, INC. (FKA TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION).. (Steele, Demian) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/5/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF PUGET SOUND COMMERCE CENTER, INC., formerly known as TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1442(a); DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL from SAN FRANCISCO SUPERIOR COURT. Their case number is CGC-19-276759. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13195580). Filed byPUGET SOUND COMMERCE CENTER, INC. (FKA TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steele, Demian) (Filed on 3/22/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SETNIK v. FINAN'S AUTO SUPPLY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FINAN'S AUTO SUPPLY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Folsom Auto Supply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOLSOM AUTO PARTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Folsom Lumber and Building Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUGET SOUND COMMERCE CENTER, INC. (FKA TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION)
Represented By: Demian David Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOLSOM BLVD. AUTO PARTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SETNIK ROBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Setnik
Represented By: Nancy Teresa Williams
Represented By: Kimberly Joy Wai Jun Chu
Represented By: Janine Marie Fiel-Cosse
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Represented By: Jason Michael Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?