Moore et al v. Addus Healthcare, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Alexandria Encinias and Mary Moore
Defendant: Addus HomeCare Corporation and Addus Healthcare, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01519
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 38 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS ADDUS HEALTHCARE, INC. AND ADDUS HOMECARE CORPORATION (McLaughlin, Gary) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the case management conference, previously set for June 25th, is continued to August 8, 2019, at 2:00 p.m., to be heard along with the #8 motion to remand, in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by August 1st. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 36 DEFENDANTS' SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Addus Healthcare, Inc., Addus HomeCare Corporation. (McLaughlin, Gary) (Filed on 6/13/2019) Modified on 6/14/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2019 Filing 35 Certificate of Interested Entities by Alexandria Encinias, Mary Moore identifying Other Affiliate Addus Healthcare, Inc., Other Affiliate Addus HomeCare Corporation for Alexandria Encinias, Mary Moore. (Avakian, Tatiana) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Tatiana G. Avakian (Avakian, Tatiana) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., TERMINATING AS MOOT Plaintiffs' #21 motion to strike portions of the amended answer in light of the parties' stipulation to file a second amended answer. See Dkt. Nos. 31-32. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #31 Stipulation to File Second Amended Answer. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 31 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to File Second Amended Answer filed by Addus Healthcare, Inc., Addus HomeCare Corporation, Mary Moore and Alexandria Encinias. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McLaughlin, Gary) (Filed on 6/7/2019) Modified on 6/10/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2019 Filing 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Attachments: #1 ADR Certification by Parties and Counse-Mary Moore)(Zabehi, Tara) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 29 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 3, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Strike #13 Amended Answer to Complaint , See Docket No. #28 : Responses due by 6/7/2019 and Replies due by 6/14/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #27 FURTHER JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS' #21 MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS' #13 AMENDED ANSWER. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 27 FURTHER JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS' #21 MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS' #13 AMENDED ANSWER filed by Addus Healthcare, Inc., Addus HomeCare Corporation, Mary Moore and Alexandria Encinias. (McLaughlin, Gary) (Filed on 5/31/2019) Modified on 6/3/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2019 Filing 26 ASSOCIATION of Counsel Stanley D. Saltzman by Alexandria Encinias, Mary Moore. (Aiwazian, Edwin) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 20, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Strike, See Docket No. #25 : Responses due by 5/31/2019 and Replies due by 6/7/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #24 Stipulation Re #21 MOTION to Strike. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 24 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule re #21 MOTION to Strike #13 Amended Answer to Complaint REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS' AMENDED ANSWER filed by Addus Healthcare, Inc., Addus HomeCare Corporation, Mary Moore and Alexandria Encinias. (McLaughlin, Gary) (Filed on 5/17/2019) Modified on 5/20/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY (re #17 MOTION to Remand ) filed byAlexandria Encinias, Mary Moore. (Zabehi, Tara) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 22 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND #17 filed by Addus Healthcare, Inc., Addus HomeCare Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Gary McLaughlin ISO Defendants' Opposition, #2 Exhibit 1 to McLaughlin Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to McLaughlin Declaration, #4 Supplement Declaration of Nicole Zdeb ISO Defendants' Opposition, #5 Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McLaughlin, Gary) (Filed on 5/6/2019) Modified on 5/7/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Strike #13 Amended Answer to Complaint filed by Alexandria Encinias, Mary Moore. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/17/2019. Replies due by 5/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zabehi, Tara) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Strike (Zabehi, Tara) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Reassignment, Standing Orders re Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, an Filing Procedure (Oakland) by Addus Healthcare, Inc., Addus HomeCare Corporation re 16 Clerk's Notice,(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(McLaughlin, Gary) (Filed on 4/23/2019) Modified on 4/24/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., DIRECTING the parties to renotice the #12 motion to strike, as the parties were directed to do in the #15 order reassigning case. The parties are DIRECTED to notice the motion to strike for August 8, 2019, to be heard concurrently with the #17 motion to remand. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand filed by Alexandria Encinias, Mary Moore. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/6/2019. Replies due by 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zabehi, Tara) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for June 25, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by June 18, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-01519-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 4/15/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED ANSWER to PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #1 Notice of Removal,,, byAddus Healthcare, Inc., Addus HomeCare Corporation. (McLaughlin, Gary) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike Answer to Removal Complaint filed by Alexandria Encinias, Mary Moore. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 4/26/2019. Replies due by 5/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zabehi, Tara) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Addus Healthcare, Inc., Addus HomeCare Corporation.. (McLaughlin, Gary) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Addus Healthcare, Inc., Addus HomeCare Corporation re #9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, TO PLAINTIFF AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF COURT'S INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(McLaughlin, Gary) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to District Court and Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Parties and to the Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court by Addus Healthcare, Inc., Addus HomeCare Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(McLaughlin, Gary) (Filed on 3/26/2019) Modified on 3/28/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor A Salcedo (Salcedo, Victor) (Filed on 3/25/2019) Modified on 3/28/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory William Knopp (Knopp, Gregory) (Filed on 3/25/2019) Modified on 3/28/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to Plaintiffs and Certificate of Service of Court's Civil New Case Documents by Addus Healthcare, Inc., Addus HomeCare Corporation re 4 Case Assigned by Intake (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (McLaughlin, Gary) (Filed on 3/25/2019) Modified on 3/28/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/8/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 22, 2019 Answer to Removed Complaint (See Doc No. #1 -16) by Addus Healthcare, Inc., Addus HomeCare Corporation. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Addus Healthcare, Inc., Addus HomeCare Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, (McLaughlin, Gary) (Filed on 3/22/2019) Modified on 3/28/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Addus Healthcare, Inc., Addus HomeCare Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Addus HomeCare Corporation for Addus Healthcare, Inc., Addus HomeCare Corporation. re #1 Notice of Removal,,, (McLaughlin, Gary) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action from Contra Costa County Superior Court. Their case number is CIVMSC18-01989. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-13197138). Filed by Addus HomeCare Corporation, Addus Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary Mclaughlin ISO Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Declaration of Nicole Zdeb ISO Defendants' Notice of Removal, #26 Civil Cover Sheet) (McLaughlin, Gary) (Filed on 3/22/2019) Modified on 3/28/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Addus Healthcare, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addus HomeCare Corporation
Represented By: Gary Matthew McLaughlin
Represented By: Victor A Salcedo
Represented By: Gregory William Knopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addus Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Matthew McLaughlin
Represented By: Victor A Salcedo
Represented By: Gregory William Knopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria Encinias
Represented By: Tatiana G. Avakian
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Represented By: Stanley Donald Saltzman
Represented By: Tara Zabehi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Moore
Represented By: Tatiana G. Avakian
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Represented By: Stanley Donald Saltzman
Represented By: Tara Zabehi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?