Hartford Fire Insurance Company v. YRC Inc.
Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: YRC Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01959
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #11 Defendant's Motion to Appear by Telephone on 7/31/2019 01:30 PM Initial Case Management Conference. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #10 Stipulation selecting Private ADR which shall be completed by 9/23/2019 (90 days from the date of this Order). (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by YRC Inc., Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Jeffries, Kathleen) (Filed on 6/25/2019) Modified on 6/26/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Appear by Telephone in Case Management Conference filed by YRC Inc. (Jeffries, Kathleen) (Filed on 6/24/2019) Modified on 6/25/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by YRC Inc. filed by YRC Inc., Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Jeffries, Kathleen) (Filed on 6/24/2019) Modified on 6/25/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by YRC Inc... (Jeffries, Kathleen) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by YRC Inc. identifying Corporate Parent YRC Worldwide, Inc. for YRC Inc.. (Jeffries, Kathleen) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint byYRC Inc.. (Jeffries, Kathleen) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 13, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hartford Fire Insurance Company.. (Fant, Philip) (Filed on 4/13/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to YRC Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/26/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hartford Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Fant, Philip) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against YRC Inc. Filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civl Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Fant, Philip) (Filed on 4/11/2019) Filing fee paid in the amount of $400.00 with receipt number 0971-13253508. Modified on 4/12/2019 (srnS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/12/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Fire Insurance Company v. YRC Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Collins Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Philip A. Fant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?