Labajo et al v. General Nutrition Corporation
Plaintiff: Howard Clark, Christina Labajo and Berry Saizon
Defendant: General Nutrition Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv01984
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #13 Stipulation Re #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2019 and Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines filed by General Nutrition Corporation, Howard Clark, Christina Labajo, Berry Saizon. (Hutchison, Andrew) (Filed on 6/28/2019) Modified on 7/1/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for July 16, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by July 9th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-01984-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byGeneral Nutrition Corporation. (Hutchison, Andrew) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by General Nutrition Corporation, Howard Clark, Christina Labajo, Berry Saizon. (Hutchison, Andrew) (Filed on 5/16/2019) Modified on 5/16/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by General Nutrition Corporation, Berry Saizon, Christina Labajo, and Howard Clark. (Hutchison, Andrew) (Filed on 4/17/2019) Modified on 4/18/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 4/17/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Howard Clark, Christina Labajo, Berry Saizon.. (Lison, Wyatt) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/12/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by General Nutrition Corporation E-filer did no t enter Information on Other Court Association. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by General Nutrition Corporation of New Case Documents (Hutchison, Andrew) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/26/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by General Nutrition Corporation . (Hutchison, Andrew) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL; (NO PROCESS); from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-19-574459. (Filing Fee of $400.00 paid, Receipt # 0971-13257306). Filed byGeneral Nutrition Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hutchison, Andrew) (Filed on 4/12/2019) Modified on 4/12/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/15/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labajo et al v. General Nutrition Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Clark
Represented By: Wyatt A. Lison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Labajo
Represented By: Wyatt A. Lison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berry Saizon
Represented By: Wyatt A. Lison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Nutrition Corporation
Represented By: Andrew M. Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?